Colorado District Court
Judge:Timothy P O'Hara
Case #: 1:25-cv-01420
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:0216 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:May 06, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 11:10 AM MDT
Defendant
Salida Hospital District
Plaintiff
Sally Herndon
Represented By
Michael Andrew Josephson
Josephson Dunlap LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 75 minutes ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
7 7 order Minute Order Fri 05/09 3:09 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara on 05/09/2025. The above captioned case has been directly assigned to Magistrate Judge O'Hara pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1. The Parties shall complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form [ECF4 ] on or before July 17, 2025. The Court will hold the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference on July 31, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom C-402, on the fourth floor of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse located at 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The Scheduling Conference shall be an in-person proceeding. However, the Court gives leave to counsel who are outside of Colorado to appear remotely by way of video conference. To do so, counsel shall follow the Cisco Meeting App Instructions that are attached to this Minute Order. No later than seven days before the Scheduling Conference, the Parties shall (1) file their Proposed Scheduling Order onto the case docket sheet and (2) submit the proposed Scheduling Order in Word format by joint email, copying all Parties, to Chambers at[LINK:o'hara_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov] . (ggill, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Tue 05/06 1:14 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alyssa J. White on behalf of Sally HerndonAttorney Alyssa J. White added to party Sally Herndon(pty:pla) (White, Alyssa)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Tue 05/06 1:12 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Andrew Wells Dunlap on behalf of Sally HerndonAttorney Andrew Wells Dunlap added to party Sally Herndon(pty:pla) (Dunlap, Andrew)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Tue 05/06 11:05 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (sadhi, )
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Summons Issued Tue 05/06 11:04 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (sadhi, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Case Assigned to Judge Tue 05/06 11:03 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy P O'Hara.Text Only Entry. (sadhi, )
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 05/06 10:38 AM
COMPLAINT against SALIDA HOSPITAL DISTRICT d/b/a HEART OF THE ROCKIES REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-10320584)Attorney Michael Andrew Josephson added to party SALLY HERNDON(pty:pla), filed by SALLY HERNDON.(Josephson, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Consent,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summons