Tennessee Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Randal S Mashburn
Case #: 2:25-bk-01916
Case Filed:May 06, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Hiawatha Manor Association, Inc.
8007 Cherokee Trl
Crossville, TN 38572-6331
Represented By
BLAKE ROTH
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Christopher Scott Kunde, Jr
Holland & Knight LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE 701 BROADWAY STE 318
NASHVILLE, TN 37203
Represented By
REBECCA JO YIELDING
Ustp
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/22/2025 12:03 PM CDT
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
18 18 virtual 10. Docket Order - Add Text. Tue 05/20 1:38 PM
ORDER by Judge Mashburn : With regard to docket entry #17 , the debtor has filed a motion to extend the time to file statements and schedules. The motion is granted, and the time is extended by 10 days to May 30, 2025. Related [+] (las)
Related: [-] 17
Monday, May 19, 2025
17 17 motion Extend Time to File Statements and Schedules - BK Motion Mon 05/19 1:43 PM
Motion to Extend Time to File Statements and Schedules to 05/30/2025. Certificate of Service mailed on 05/19/2025. Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Hiawatha Manor Association, Inc.. (ROTH, BLAKE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service - BK Notice Tue 05/13 4:43 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service pursuant to Rule 2002. Filed on the behalf of: Creditor Ford Motor Credit Company LLC, c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LLC. (Sharma, Amitkumar)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Mon 05/12 11:29 AM
Certificate of Service mailed on 05/06/2025, 05/09/2025, 05/12/2025 Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Hiawatha Manor Association, Inc. Related [+]. (ROTH, BLAKE)
Related: [-] 9 , 12 ,14
14 14 6 pgs motion Employ - BK Motion Mon 05/12 11:11 AM
Application and Notice to Employ Commercial Real Estate Exchange, Inc. as Other. If timely response hearing will be held 6/24/2025 at 09:30 AM, Courtroom 1 (Virtual hearing if allowed; see website for details); 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203. Responses due by 6/6/2025. Certificate of Service mailed on 05/12/2025. Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Hiawatha Manor Association, Inc.. (ROTH, BLAKE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 2 pgs Declaration
Saturday, May 10, 2025
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 05/10 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 05/10/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Friday, May 09, 2025
12 12 virtual 10. Docket Order - Add Text. Fri 05/09 12:39 PM
ORDER by Judge Mashburn : With regard to docket entry #9 , the debtor has filed a motion seeking authority to retain existing bank accounts. Even though it was filed in a manner that seems to treat it as a motion under LBR 9013-1, it does not comply with the local rule since it does not meet the requirements of LBR 9013-1(c)(1) and (2). Counsel for the debtor shall promptly serve the required notice that includes the response deadline and hearing date. Related [+] (las)
Related: [-] 9
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
11 11 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Wed 05/07 8:17 AM
Meeting of Creditors to be held on 6/3/2025 at 01:30 PM via Meeting held telephonically. Please call 877-934-2472 and enter code 8613356# to attend. Last day to File Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 8/4/2025. (YIELDING, REBECCA)
Related: [-]
10 10 trustee Notice - Chapter 11 DIP Initial UST Conf Wed 05/07 8:16 AM
Notice - Debtor(s) Initial Conference will be held on 5/13/25 at 11:00 A.M. (YIELDING, REBECCA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
9 9 motion Retain Bank Accounts - BK Motion Tue 05/06 12:12 PM
Motion for Order Authorizing Debtor to Retain Existing Bank Accounts, Cash Management System and Business Forms . If timely response hearing will be held 6/10/2025 at 09:30 AM, Courtroom 1 (Virtual hearing if allowed; see website for details); 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203. Responses due by 5/28/2025. Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Hiawatha Manor Association, Inc.. (ROTH, BLAKE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Declaration
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service - BK Notice Tue 05/06 10:55 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service pursuant to Rule 2002. Filed on the behalf of: U.S. Trustee US TRUSTEE. (YIELDING, REBECCA)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service - BK Notice Tue 05/06 9:17 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service pursuant to Rule 2002. Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Hiawatha Manor Association, Inc.. (Kunde, Christopher)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Complaint Tue 05/06 9:13 AM
Adversary case 2:25-ap-90052. Complaint by Hiawatha Manor Association, Inc., Carol Jo Carrara against Carol Jo Carrara. This Adversary is Being Filed On Behalf of the Debtor. Hiawatha Manor Association, Inc., Carol Jo Carrara. Nature of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment)) (ROTH, BLAKE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
5 5 cmp Complaint Tue 05/06 8:52 AM
Adversary case 2:25-ap-90051. Complaint by Hiawatha Manor Association, Inc. against Charles H. Abernathy. This Adversary is Being Filed On Behalf of the Debtor. Hiawatha Manor Association, Inc.. Nature of Suit: (91 (Declaratory judgment)) (ROTH, BLAKE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
4 4 2 pgs misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Tue 05/06 8:27 AM
Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders . Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Hiawatha Manor Association, Inc.. (ROTH, BLAKE)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations Tue 05/06 8:26 AM
Disclosure of Corporate Affiliations . Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Hiawatha Manor Association, Inc.. (ROTH, BLAKE)
Related: [-]
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Payment Tue 05/06 8:24 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:2:25-bk-01916] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00). Receipt number A19240986. Fee amount $ 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 14 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 05/06 8:23 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount is $1738.00. Incomplete Filings due by 05/20/2025. Chapter 11 Plan due by 09/3/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 09/3/2025. (ROTH, BLAKE)
Related: [-]