Miller v. Medford Wellington Service Co., Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10576
Lead BK case is: 1:23-bk-10576
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Thomas M Horan |
Case #: | 1:25-ap-50856 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | May 05, 2025 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Medford Wellington Service Co., Inc.
PO Box 961
Worcester, MA 01613 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George L. Miller, in his capacity as Chapter 7 Trustee of Christmas Tree Shops, LLC et al.
1628 John F. Kennedy Boulevard Suite 950
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 1:05 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 15, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons and Notice of Pretrial Conference Served on Defendant Medford Wellington Service Co., Inc.. Pretrial Conference set for 7/22/2025 at 10:00 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #5, Wilmington, Delaware. (Keane, Peter) |
|
Monday, May 05, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
crditcrd
none
Mon 05/05 4:40 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Complaint([LINK 25-50856 TMH] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt Number A12160695, amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 25-50856 Complaint for Avoidance and Recovery of Preferential Transfers Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. §§ 547 & 550 by George L. Miller against Medford Wellington Service Co., Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)). AP Summons Served due date: 8/4/2025. (Sandler, Bradford) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |