Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-20188

Maine Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Peter G Cary
Case #: 2:25-ap-02006
Nature of Suit41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kevin J Mattson
10 Cranberry Ridge Road
Freeport, ME 04032
Represented By
Kevin J Mattson
contact info
Plaintiff
Montresor LLC
PO Box 7340
Portland, ME 04112
Represented By
Randy J. Creswell, Esq.
Creswell Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Mon 05/12 10:54 AM
Notice of Appearance of Attorney by David C. Johnson Esq. Filed by on behalf of Kevin J Mattson. (Johnson, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Mon 05/12 10:52 AM
Notice of Appearance of Attorney by Lee H. Bals Esq. Filed by on behalf of Kevin J Mattson. (Bals, Lee)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 05/07 10:46 AM
Summons Service Executed on Kevin J Mattson 5/7/2025 . (Creswell, Randy)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Summons Issued Wed 05/07 10:12 AM
Summons Issued on Kevin J Mattson Date Issued 5/7/2025, Answer Due 6/6/202 Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/8/2025 at 09:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom, Portland. Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/1/2025. (mep)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Montresor LLC
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
2 2 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Tue 05/06 1:06 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement, with Certificate of Service filed. Filed by Montresor LLC. (Creswell, Randy)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint ** Use Open an AP Case to Open Adversary ** Mon 05/05 11:05 PM
Adversary case 25-02006 Complaint by Montresor LLC against Kevin J Mattson. Fee Amount $ 350.. (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e))) (Creswell, Randy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet