California Eastern District Court
Judge:Christopher D Baker
Case #: 1:25-cv-00527
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 11:04 AM PDT
Defendant
Microsoft Corporation
Plaintiff
Tanbeer Singh Brar
4725 Panama Lane Suite D3
Bakersfield, CA 93313


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
3 3 4 pgs order Order to Show Cause Thu 05/08 7:55 AM
ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why this Action Should not be Dismissed for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 5/7/2025. Show Cause Response due within Twenty-One (21) Days. (Deputy Clerk SSA)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Thu 05/08 7:55 AM
SERVICE BY MAIL:3 Order to Show Cause, served on Tanbeer Singh Brar. (Deputy Clerk SSA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 05/06 10:11 AM
COMPLAINT against Microsoft Corporation by Tanbeer Singh Brar. (Deputy Clerk SSA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
misc IFP Application Tue 05/06 10:18 AM
APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Deputy Clerk SSA)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
2 2 motion In Forma Pauperis Tue 05/06 10:16 AM
MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Tanbeer Singh Brar. (Deputy Clerk SSA)
Related: [-]