Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Brian E Murphy
Case #: 1:25-cv-11245
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Case Filed:May 06, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
12 12 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 05/09 10:04 AM
Judge Brian E. Murphy: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting11 Assented to Motion for Extension of Time to 05/16/2025 to to Respond to Petitioner's Habeas Petition. (BIB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
11 11 motion Extension of Time Thu 05/08 4:22 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 05/16/2025 to to Respond to Petitioner's Habeas Petition by Patricia Hyde, Michael Krol, Todd Lyons, Kristi Noem.(Farquhar, Rayford)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 05/08 11:40 AM
Judge Brian E. Murphy: ELECTRONIC ORDER granting9 Assented to Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Petitioner's Habeas Petition until May 9, 2025. (BIB)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Extension of Time Thu 05/08 10:59 AM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 05/09/2025 to To Respond to Petitioner's Habeas Petition by Patricia Hyde, Michael Krol, Todd Lyons, Kristi Noem.(Farquhar, Rayford)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Copy Mailed Thu 05/08 10:33 AM
Copy re5 Order,1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) mailed to Patricia Hyde, Michael Krol, Todd Lyons and Kristi Noem on 5/8/2025. (MBM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
7 7 misc Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet Wed 05/07 9:26 AM
Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re6 Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet CATEGORY SHEET by Felistus Criswell. (Tymann, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet Wed 05/07 9:25 AM
Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet by Felistus Criswell. (Tymann, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
5 5 4 pgs order Order Tue 05/06 5:05 PM
Judge Brian E. Murphy: ORDER CONCERNING SERVICE OF PETITION AND STAY OF TRANSFER OR REMOVAL...Respondents shall answer or otherwise respond to the petition in writing no later than Thursday May 8, 2025, at 12:00 p.m... (BIB)
Related: [-]
4 4 order General Order 19-02 Tue 05/06 3:49 PM
General Order 19-02, dated June 1, 2019 regarding Public Access to Immigration Cases Restricted by Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). (MBM)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Case Assignment Tue 05/06 3:39 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Brian E. Murphy assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jessica D. Hedges. (JKK)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice - Other Tue 05/06 3:31 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel shall complete and file in PDF format both a Local Category Form & a Civil Cover Sheet. Both forms can be found on the court's website under Resources/Forms. Counsel will use the event under Other Documents - Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet. (NMC)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2241 Tue 05/06 2:57 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number AMADC-10992226 Fee status: Filing Fee paid., filed by Felistus CriswellL.(Tymann, Benjamin) Modified on 5/6/2025 (NMC)
Related: [-]