Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey P Norman
Case #: 4:25-bk-32566
Case Filed:May 06, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$50,001 to $100,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
JBSB Destiny Enterprises Co.
13119 Brayton Ct
Houston, TX 77065
Represented By
Robert C Lane
The Lane Law Firm
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 3:26 PM CDT
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Saturday, May 10, 2025
29 29 trustee Ch 11 Subch V Notice Appointing Trustee Sat 05/10 7:53 AM
Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee. Melissa A Haselden added to case as trustee. (Whitworth, Jana)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/09 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Order on Emergency Motion
27 27 trustee Chapter 11 Meeting of Creditors for Corporate Debtor Set (BNC NOTICING) Fri 05/09 9:42 AM
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 for Non-Individual Debtor Set 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/5/2025 at 01:30 PM, US Trustee Houston Teleconference. Last day to object to dischargeability under section 523 is 8/4/2025. Proofs of Claims due by 7/15/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 11/5/2025. (Whitworth, Jana)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Exhibit List Fri 05/09 7:18 AM
Witness List, Exhibit List (Filed By JBSB Destiny Enterprises Co. ) Related [+] (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-] 18 Emergency Motion
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Budget
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - UCC Lien List
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - UCC Home Bank - Pos 1
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - UCC Pawnee Pos 2
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Schedules
Thursday, May 08, 2025
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/08 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order Setting Hearing
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/08 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Emergency Motion
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/08 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Emergency Motion
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/08 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order on Emergency Motion
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 05/08 2:54 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Kyle L Dickson Filed by on behalf of Home Bank, N.A. (Dickson, Kyle)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice Thu 05/08 1:26 PM
Notice of Interim Hearing . Related [+] Filed by JBSB Destiny Enterprises Co. (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-] 18 Emergency Motion,19 Order Setting Hearing
19 19 order Setting Hearing Thu 05/08 12:55 PM
Order Setting Hearing Signed on 5/8/2025 Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 5/12/2025 at 11:30 AM at Houston, Courtroom 403 (JPN). (srh4)
Related: [-] 18 Emergency Motion
18 18 motion Emergency Motion Thu 05/08 11:19 AM
Emergency Motion FOR AUTHORITY TO USE CASH COLLATERAL Filed by Debtor JBSB Destiny Enterprises Co. (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Budget
Att: 2 Exhibit B - UCC Lien List
Att: 3 Complaint C - UCC Home Bank Pos 1
Att: 4 Exhibit D - UCC Pawnee Pos 2
Att: 5 Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
17 17 motion Employ Wed 05/07 1:49 PM
Application to Employ The Lane Law Firm, PLLC as Debtor's Attorney. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Debtor JBSB Destiny Enterprises Co. Hearing scheduled for 6/4/2025 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 403 (JPN). (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 Declaration
Att: 3 Proposed Order
16 16 order Emergency Wed 05/07 1:38 PM
Order Denying Emergency Motion Without Prejudice Related [+] Signed on 5/7/2025. (srh4)
Related: [-] 15
15 15 5 pgs motion Emergency Motion Wed 05/07 10:46 AM
Emergency Motion FOR AUTHORITY TO USE CASH COLLATERAL Filed by Debtor JBSB Destiny Enterprises Co. (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Budget
Att: 2 Exhibit B - UCC Lien List
Att: 3 Proposed Order
14 14 misc Declaration Wed 05/07 8:12 AM
Declaration re: Electronic Filing (Filed By JBSB Destiny Enterprises Co. ) Related [+] (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
trustee Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/07 1:01 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jana Smith Whitworth (Whitworth, Jana)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
13 13 order Setting Hearing Tue 05/06 4:01 PM
Order to Debtor-in-Possession in a Small Business Case Subchapter V and Setting Status Conference Signed on 5/6/2025 Related [+] Status conference to be held on 6/24/2025 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 403 (JPN). (srh4)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
12 12 order Emergency Tue 05/06 3:56 PM
Order Denying Emergency Motion Related [+] Signed on 5/6/2025. (srh4)
Related: [-] 2
11 11 misc Tax Documents Tue 05/06 3:49 PM
Tax Documents for the Year 2023. Tax documents are available for reviewing in the office of the clerk (Filed By JBSB Destiny Enterprises Co. ). (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Equity Security Holders Tue 05/06 3:45 PM
Equity Security Holders (Filed By JBSB Destiny Enterprises Co. ). (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Statement of Operations Tue 05/06 3:43 PM
Statement of Operations for Small Business (Filed By JBSB Destiny Enterprises Co. ). (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Cash Flow Statement Tue 05/06 3:43 PM
Cash Flow Statement for Small Business (Filed By JBSB Destiny Enterprises Co. ). (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Balance Sheet Tue 05/06 3:42 PM
Balance Sheet (Filed By JBSB Destiny Enterprises Co. ). (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Emergency Tue 05/06 3:28 PM
Order Granting Emergency Motion to Pay Independent Contractors Pre-Petition Compensation Related [+] Signed on 5/6/2025. (srh4)
Related: [-] 4
5 5 order Emergency Tue 05/06 3:26 PM
Order on Debtor's Motion for Entry of An Order Authorizing Payment of Pre-Petition Wages in the Ordinary Course of Business Related [+] Signed on 5/6/2025. (srh4)
Related: [-] 3
4 4 5 pgs motion Emergency Motion Tue 05/06 2:40 PM
Emergency Motion TO PAY INDEPENDENT CONTRACTORS PREPETITION COMPENSATION Filed by Debtor JBSB Destiny Enterprises Co. (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Proposed Order
3 3 7 pgs motion Emergency Motion Tue 05/06 2:36 PM
Emergency Motion FOR ENTRY OF AN ORDER AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF PRE-PETITION WAGES IN THE ORDINARY COURSE OF BUSINESS Filed by Debtor JBSB Destiny Enterprises Co. (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint A - Payroll Summary
Att: 2 Proposed Order
2 2 5 pgs motion Emergency Motion Tue 05/06 2:32 PM
Emergency Motion FOR AUTHORITY TO USE CASH COLLATERAL Filed by Debtor JBSB Destiny Enterprises Co. (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Budget
Att: 2 Exhibit B - UCC Lien List
Att: 3 Proposed Order
1 1 45 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Tue 05/06 2:01 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by JBSB Destiny Enterprises Co.. (Lane, Robert)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Tue 05/06 2:03 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-32566 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A26132019. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
utility Update Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadlines Wed 05/07 9:54 AM
Plan or Disclosure Statement Deadline Updated Chapter 11 Plan due by 8/4/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 8/4/2025. (srh4)
Related: [-]