Oklahoma Northern District Court
Judge:Mark T Steele
Case #: 4:25-cv-00225
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 06, 2025
Case in other court:Tulsa Cty District Ct, CJ-25-01610
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 2:08 PM CDT
Defendant
State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By
Jessica Lynn Dickerson
Mcafee & Taft (tulsa)
contact info
William J. Holland
Mcafee & Taft
contact info
Plaintiff
Anna Pina
Represented By
Ashley Holbrook Leavitt
Holbrook Leavitt & Associates, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
10 10 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Thu 05/08 9:18 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anna Pina (Leavitt, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
9 9 notice Appearance - Attorney Wed 05/07 11:17 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ashley Holbrook Leavitt on behalf of Anna Pina (Leavitt, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
8 8 respoth Answer Tue 05/06 1:45 PM
ANSWER with Jury Demand Related [+] by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Dickerson, Jessica)
Related: [-] State Court Petition/Complaint
7 7 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - Party(ies) to File Disclosure Statement Tue 05/06 12:20 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing Anna Pina and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company to file a Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 and LCvR 7.1-1, if applicable. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (cjb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
6 6 order 15 - Notice of Assignment of Case to MJ Tue 05/06 12:19 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. ACTION REQUIRED: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States magistrate judge for all purposes, including trial, final entry of judgment, and direct review by the Tenth Circuit Court of Appeals. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge, if the attached form is not signed and returned within the applicable deadline. The plaintiff or removing party must serve a copy of this notice upon all other parties to this action. (cjb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance - Attorney Tue 05/06 12:17 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William J. Holland on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company [Note: Attorney William J. Holland added to party State Farm Fire and Casualty Company(pty:dft).] (Holland, William)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Appearance - Attorney Tue 05/06 12:16 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jessica Lynn Dickerson on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Dickerson, Jessica)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) Tue 05/06 12:16 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Auto Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Dickerson, Jessica)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Removal Tue 05/06 12:15 PM
NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Tulsa County, case number CJ-2025-1610 (paid $405 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-3204797) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (With attachments) (Dickerson, Jessica)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/06 12:12 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Dickerson, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
cmp State Court Petition/Complaint Tue 05/06 12:02 PM
PETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against All Defendants by Anna Pina (cjb, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]