Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Panayotta D Augustin-Bir
Case #: 0:25-cv-60893
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel, Assault, Slander
Case Filed:May 06, 2025
Case in other court:New Jersey, 3:25-cv-01413
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 4:06 PM EDT
Defendant
DAVID BEHAR
403 WATER STREET
TEMPLE, PA 19560
Defendant
MIAMI SEPHARDIC CLUB LLC.
Plaintiff
ELLIOT M. HIRSCH
7 SAXONY DRIVE
OAKHURST, NJ 07755


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
8 8 order Judge Assignment Tue 05/06 3:20 PM
Judge Assignment to Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch (bb)
Related: [-]
7 7 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE Tue 05/06 3:06 PM
Case transferred in from New Jersey; Case Number 3:25-cv-01413. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(bb)
Related: [-]
6 6 9 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 05/06 2:46 PM
MEMORANDUM ORDER transferring case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida. Signed by Judge Robert Kirsch on 5/6/2025. (mlh)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 05/06 2:47 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
5 5 APPLICATION to proceed IN FORMA PAUPERIS by ELLIOT M. HIRSCH. Related [+](dmr3)
Related: [-] ceived via ADS
Att: 1 IFP Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 17, 2025
4 4 TEXT ORDER : This matter comes before the Court following the filing of a Complaint and application to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP) by Plaintiff Elliot M. Hirsch. (ECF No.1 .) Plaintiff has failed to file the proper IFP application, which can be found at[LINK:https://www.njd.uscourts.gov/forms] , or[LINK:here] . The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of a blank long-form IFP application to Plaintiff by US regular mail. Should Plaintiff wish to proceed, Plaintiff must file a complete long-form IFP application or pay the filing fee by April 15, 2025. So Ordered by Judge Robert Kirsch on 03/17/2025. (pdm)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
3 3 Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (dmr3)
Related: [-]
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (dmr3)
Related: [-]
Saturday, February 22, 2025
2 2 Consent & Registration Form to Receive Documents Electronically by ELLIOT M. HIRSCH Related [+]. (dmr3)
Related: [-] ceived via ADS
1 1 Complaint Received Related [+].(dmr3)
Related: [-] ceived via ADS
Att: 1 IFP Application,
Att: 2 IFP Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (dmr3)
Related: [-]