California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Martin R Barash
Case #: 1:25-bk-10785
Case Filed:May 06, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Megna Hospitality Investments,Inc.
8740 Winnetka Ave
Northridge, CA 91324-3232
Represented By
Michael D Kwasigroch
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SV)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Saturday, May 10, 2025
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Sat 05/10 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/10/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Friday, May 09, 2025
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 05/09 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/09/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1)
Thursday, May 08, 2025
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 05/08 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (VAN-197) (BNC)
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 05/08 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Megna Hospitality Investments,Inc.
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 05/08 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Megna Hospitality Investments,Inc.
12 12 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Thu 05/08 10:21 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Harris, Douglas. (Harris, Douglas)
Related: [-]
11 11 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Thu 05/08 10:18 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Lerner, Leib. (Lerner, Leib)
Related: [-]
10 10 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Thu 05/08 10:07 AM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document List of Creditors (mailing list) does not match the uploaded creditors .txt file. There is a $34 fee to add new creditors who were not originally on the initial mailing matrix. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO REFILE THE LIST OF CREDITORS (MAILING LIST) WITH CORRECT INFORMATION. Related [+] (TK)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Megna Hospitality Investments,Inc.
9 9 court Hearing Set (Other) (BK Case - BNC Option) Thu 05/08 6:58 AM
Hearing Set - Scheduling and case management conference Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 6/11/2025 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 303, 21041 Burbank Blvd, Woodland Hills, CA 91367. The case judge is Martin R. Barash (JC)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Megna Hospitality Investments,Inc.
8 8 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Thu 05/08 6:57 AM
Order Setting Scheduling and Case Management Conference (BNC-PDF) Signed on 5/8/2025. (JC)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Thu 05/08 12:15 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:1:25-bk-10785] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A58396077. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
7 7 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (Corporations or Partnerships) (309F1) Wed 05/07 3:23 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/10/2025 at 11:00 AM at UST-SVND2, TELEPHONIC MEETING. CONFERENCE LINE:1-866-820-9498, PARTICIPANT CODE:6468388. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 8/11/2025. (AG1)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice Wed 05/07 9:31 AM
Notice of Non-Consent to Use of Cash Collateral Filed by Creditor Royal Business Bank. (Smith, Scott)
Related: [-]
5 5 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Wed 05/07 9:27 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Harvey, Brian. (Harvey, Brian)
Related: [-]
4 4 nef Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Wed 05/07 9:26 AM
Request for courtesy Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Filed by Smith, Scott. (Smith, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
3 3 court Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required Tue 05/06 2:54 PM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect schedules /statements recorded as deficient. Only select deficiencies specific to the type of case being filed: Ch 11 Non-Individual with an attorney. THE PROPER DEFICIENCIES HAVE BEEN ISSUED. Related [+] (TK)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Megna Hospitality Investments,Inc.
2 2 court Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (VAN-197) Tue 05/06 2:26 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Case If Required Documents Are Not Filed Within 72 Hours (BNC) . (TK)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Tue 05/06 12:51 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Megna Hospitality Investments,Inc. List of Equity Security Holders due 05/20/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum or 206Sum ) due 05/20/2025. Schedule A/B: Property (Form 106A/B or 206A/B) due 05/20/2025. Schedule C: The Property You Claim as Exempt (Form 106C) due 05/20/2025. Schedule D: Creditors Who Have Claims Secured by Property (Form 106D or 206D) due 05/20/2025. Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims (Form 106E/F or 206E/F) due 05/20/2025. Schedule G: Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases (Form 106G or 206G) due 05/20/2025. Schedule H: Your Codebtors (Form 106H or 206H) due 05/20/2025. Schedule I: Your Income (Form 106I) due 05/20/2025. Schedule J: Your Expenses (Form 106J) due 05/20/2025. Declaration About an Individual Debtors Schedules (Form 106Dec) due 05/20/2025. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) due 05/20/2025. Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 or 207) due 05/20/2025. Chapter 11 Statement of Your Current Monthly Income (Form 122B) Due: 05/20/2025. Statement About Your Social Security Numbers (Form 121) due by 05/20/2025. Signature of Attorney on Petition (Form 101 or 201) due 05/20/2025. Schedule J-2: Expenses for Separate Household of Debtor 2 (Form 106J-2) due 05/20/2025. Corporate Resolution Authorizing Filing of Petition due 05/20/2025. Corporate Ownership Statement (LBR Form F1007-4) due by 05/20/2025. Statement of Related Cases (LBR Form F1015-2) due 05/20/2025. Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) due 05/20/2025. Declaration by Debtors as to Whether Income was Received from an Employer within 60-Days of the Petition Date (LBR Form F1002-1) due by 05/20/2025. Verification of Master Mailing List of Creditors (LBR Form F1007-1) due 05/20/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 05/20/2025. (Kwasigroch, Michael)
Related: [-]