Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Shalina D Kumar
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 4:25-cv-11327
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:May 06, 2025
Case in other court:California Northern, 3:25-cv-02300
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 4:08 PM EDT
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
Represented By
Roger P. Meyers
Bush Seyferth & Paige, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kyle Frankowski
Represented By
Timothy G. Blood
Blood Hurst & O'Reardon, LLP
contact info
Anthony Parkhill
Barnow And Associates, P.C.
contact info
Ben Barnow
Barnow Assoc.
contact info

GPO May 06 2025
Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 15 Motion to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Michigan. (jmd, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2025) [Transferred from cand on 5/6/2025.]

Docket last updated: 16 minutes ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
4 4 order Reassignment/Disqualification Fri 05/09 9:56 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge F. Kay Behm and Magistrate Judge Curtis Ivy, Jr to District Judge Shalina D. Kumar and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti. (NAhm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
3 3 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Tue 05/06 3:53 PM
Docket Sheet from California Northern; Case Number 3:25-cv-02300.
Related: [-]
2 2 Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 15 Motion to Transfer Case to the Eastern District of Michigan. (jmd, COURT STAFF) [Transferred from cand on 5/6/2025.]
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs TRANSFERRED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against Ford Motor Company, (Filing Fee: $405.00, receipt number ACANDC-20422289). Filed by Kyle Frankowski.(Blood, Timothy) [Transferred from California Northern; Case Number 3:25-cv-02300.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex. A,
Att: 2 Ex. B,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Transferred In - Text-Only Notice Tue 05/06 3:56 PM
TEXT-ONLY NOTICE: This case has been transferred from the Northern District of California. Pending motions must be refiled on this court's docket by the filing party. Attorneys not admitted to practice in this court must complete the attorney admissions application and be admitted before appearing on this court's docket. All previously filed documents can be accessed on the originating court's docket using PACER. (VLun)
Related: [-]