Georgia Southern District Court
Judge:Lisa G Wood
Referred: Benjamin W Cheesbro
Case #: 2:25-cv-00074
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:May 06, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 5:08 PM EDT
Defendant
Donald J. Trump
Plaintiff
William B. Jolley
73 Bartram Trail
Brunswick, GA 31523


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Filing Thu 05/08 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Filing Certificate of Service by William B. Jolley re1 Complaint. (gmh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
4 4 order Rule 26(f) Order Tue 05/06 4:43 PM
RULE 26(f) ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro on 5/6/2025. (SLC)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 05/06 4:42 PM
MOTION Requesting Service of Process by William B. Jolley. Responses due by 5/20/2025. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (SLC)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 05/06 4:33 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William B. Jolley. Responses due by 5/20/2025. REFERRED to Judge Benjamin W. Cheesbro. (SLC)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/06 4:29 PM
PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS to President Donald J. Trump, filed by William B. Jolley.. (SLC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Motions Referred Tue 05/06 5:32 PM
MOTIONS REFERRED:3 MOTION Requesting Service of Process. (csr)
Related: [-]