Texas Western District Court
Judge:David A Ezra
Case #: 1:25-cv-00682
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 06, 2025
Case in other court:Texas Eastern, 6:25-cv-00150
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 4:16 PM CDT
Defendant
IV-D Agency Operating in Texas
Defendant
Ruth Anne Thornton
Plaintiff
Carlos Berlanga
of the Family Berlanga 565 N. Illinois Avenue
Brownsville, TX 78521
Plaintiff
Damaray Griffin
of the Family Griffin 500 Rock Creek Drive
Princeton, TX 75407
Plaintiff
Veronica Gisselle Schaefer
of the Family Schaefer 8523 Treetop Heights Dr.
Baytown, TX 77523


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
4 4 misc Case Opening Letter Wed 05/07 10:37 AM
Case Transferred Letter sent via U.S. Mail. (kp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
3 3 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Tue 05/06 3:24 PM
Case electronically transferred in from the Eastern District of Texas-Tyler Division; Case Number 6:25-cv-00150.
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs order Order Tue 05/06 2:21 PM
ORDER OF TRANSFER re1 Complaint filed by Carlos Berlanga, Damaray Griffin, Veronica Gisselle Schaefer. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the Austin Division of the Western District of Texas immediately forthwith. Signed by Magistrate Judge John D. Love on 5/6/2025. (gsm)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/07 10:35 AM
Case assigned to Judge David A. Ezra. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Wed 05/07 10:36 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark Lane. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Wed 05/07 10:36 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Carlos Berlanga, Demaray Griffin, Veronica Gisselle Schaefer. (kp)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . Mailed to Pltfs on 5/2/25. (kcv) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/6/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
1 1 42:1983 Class Action COMPLAINT against IV-D Agency Operating in Texas, Ruth Anne Thornton, filed by Veronica Gisselle Schaefer, Carlos Berlanga, Damaray Griffin.(kcv) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/6/2025.]
Related: [-]
Filing fee paid: $ 405.00, receipt number 600069221 (kcv) [Transferred from Texas Eastern on 5/6/2025.]
Related: [-]