Kansas District Court
Judge:Eric F Melgren
Referred: Brooks G Severson
Case #: 6:25-cv-01089
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:May 06, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 5:10 PM CDT
Defendant
Elk Energy Holdings, LLC
Plaintiff
Great Plains Petroleum, LLC
Represented By
Joshua Nicolay
Stull, Beverlin, Nicolay & Haas, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 05/08 9:26 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Great Plains Petroleum, LLC. Elk Energy Holdings, LLC waiver sent on 5/7/2025, answer due 7/7/2025. (Nicolay, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Wed 05/07 8:50 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Eric F. Melgren and Magistrate Judge Brooks G. Severson for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at https://www.uscourts.gov/file/459/download (jk)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Wed 05/07 11:07 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Elk Energy Holdings, LLC (issued to two different addresses) (issued to Attorney for service). Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (jk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
4 4 misc Designation of Place of Trial Tue 05/06 5:10 PM
DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Great Plains Petroleum, LLC - trial to be held in Wichita. (Nicolay, Joshua)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/06 5:08 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Great Plains Petroleum, LLC identifying none as corporate parent . (Nicolay, Joshua)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/06 4:47 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Great Plains Petroleum, LLC. (Nicolay, Joshua)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint (attorney) Tue 05/06 4:45 PM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Wichita ( Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6649530.), filed by Great Plains Petroleum, LLC.(Nicolay, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F