Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Eduardo V Rodriguez
Case #: 4:25-bk-32573
Case Filed:May 06, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
ESCO Oil Operating Company LLC
5005 Riverway Dr Ste 440
Houston, TX 77056-2123
Represented By
William P Haddock
Pendergraft & Simon
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002


Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago
Friday, May 23, 2025
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/23 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order Setting Hearing
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 05/23 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 05/23/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order Setting Hearing
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 05/23 11:10 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Robert Lewis Pendergraft Filed by on behalf of ESCO Oil Operating Company LLC (Pendergraft, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 22, 2025
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 05/22 4:25 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Laura Crabtree Filed by on behalf of Mesa Southern CWS Acquisition, LP d/b/a Mesa Southern Well Servicing (Crabtree, Laura)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice Thu 05/22 1:44 PM
Notice of Appearance . Filed by ESCO Oil Operating Company LLC (Simon, Leonard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 21, 2025
13 13 order Setting Hearing Wed 05/21 2:41 PM
*Amended* Order Setting Electronic Chapter 11 Initial Subchapter V Status Conference. Signed on 5/21/2025 Related [+] Status conference to be held on 6/23/2025 at 09:30 AM via telephone and video conference. (njc7)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
12 12 order Setting Hearing Wed 05/21 2:37 PM
Order Setting Electronic Chapter 11 Initial Subchapter V Status Conference. Signed on 5/21/2025 Related [+] Status conference to be held on 6/23/2025 at 03:30 PM via telephone and video conference. (njc7)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Monday, May 19, 2025
11 11 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Mon 05/19 7:05 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual (Filed By ESCO Oil Operating Company LLC ). (Haddock, William)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Schedule A/B Mon 05/19 7:01 PM
Schedule A/B: Property Non-Individual , Schedule D Non-Individual- Creditors Having Claims Secured by Property , Schedule E/F: Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims Non-Individual , Schedule G Non-Individual- Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases , Schedule H Non-Individual- Codebtors (Filed By ESCO Oil Operating Company LLC ). (Haddock, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 05/16 11:28 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Richard Glenn Foster Filed by on behalf of Arrow Drilling Company, Inc. (Foster, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 05/14 11:37 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/14/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Generic Order
Monday, May 12, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 05/12 4:49 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Don Stecker Filed by on behalf of Eagle Pass ISD (Stecker, Don)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Generic Order Mon 05/12 1:01 PM
Interim Order Signed on 5/12/2025 (njc7)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 11, 2025
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sun 05/11 11:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 40. Notice Date 05/11/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 for Non-Individual Debtor Set
Friday, May 09, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 05/09 3:19 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Kimberly A Walsh Filed by on behalf of Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts, Revenue Accounting Division (Walsh, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
3 3 trustee Chapter 11 Meeting of Creditors for Corporate Debtor Set (BNC NOTICING) Fri 05/09 8:15 AM
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 for Non-Individual Debtor Set 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/12/2025 at 11:00 AM, US Trustee Houston Teleconference. Last day to object to dischargeability under section 523 is 8/11/2025. Proofs of Claims due by 7/15/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 11/5/2025. (Ruff, Jayson)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs trustee Ch 11 Subch V Notice Appointing Trustee Fri 05/09 8:12 AM
Notice of Appointment of Chapter 11 Subchapter V Trustee. Thomas A Howley added to case as trustee. (Ruff, Jayson)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Exhibit Verified Statement
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
trustee Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 05/07 9:25 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jayson B. Ruff (Ruff, Jayson)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
1 1 4 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Tue 05/06 5:02 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by ESCO Oil Operating Company LLC. Chapter 11 Plan (Small Business) due by 08/4/2025. (Haddock, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders
Att: 2 Verification of Creditor Matrix
crditcrd none Tue 05/06 5:04 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-32573 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A26133274. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
misc Creditor Mailing List Loaded Tue 05/06 5:07 PM
Creditor Mailing List Uploaded by Attorney. (Filed By ESCO Oil Operating Company LLC ). (Haddock, William)
Related: [-]