Colorado District Court
Judge:Cyrus Y Chung
Case #: 1:25-cv-01425
Nature of Suit195 Contract - Contract Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:May 06, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 5:11 PM MDT
Defendant
CCRM Management Company Holdings, LP
Defendant
CCRM Parent Holdings, Inc
Defendant
CCRM Practice, LLC
Plaintiff
Sonal Keenan Bhatia
Plaintiff
Randi Maves
Plaintiff
Stacy Tyman


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
5 5 order Minute Order Wed 05/07 10:49 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The above captioned case has been directly assigned to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1. Magistrate Consent Form due 7/8/2025. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/8/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 7/15/2025 10:30 AM in Courtroom C205 before Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall notify all Parties who have not entered an appearance of the date and time of the Scheduling Conference . Entered by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 5/7/2025. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Summons Issued Wed 05/07 9:15 AM
SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (efoga, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form
3 3 misc Case Assigned to Judge Wed 05/07 9:11 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
Related: [-]
2 2 74 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 05/07 8:47 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-10322510)Attorney Seth Alan Katz added to party Stacy Tyman(pty:pla), Attorney Seth Alan Katz added to party Sonal Keenan Bhatia(pty:pla), Attorney Seth Alan Katz added to party Randi Maves(pty:pla), filed by Stacy Tyman, Randi Maves, Sonal Keenan Bhatia.(Katz, Seth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons
1 1 misc Administrative Notice Wed 05/07 8:15 AM
Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening, and no initiating document. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (agryan)
Related: [-]