Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Darrel James Papillion
Referred: Donna Phillips Currault
Case #: 2:25-cv-00887
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:May 06, 2025
Case in other court:Civil District Court, 25-02771
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 6:11 PM CDT
Defendant
INTERLINC MORTGAGE SERVICES, LLC
Timothy G. Byrd, Jr. McGlinchey Stafford, PLLC 601 Poydras Street, 12th Floor
New Orleans, LA 70130
Represented By
Timothy G Byrd
Mcglinchey Stafford, Pllc (new Orleans)
contact info
Plaintiff
Audubon Street Holdings, LLC
Eric Oliver Person 1539 Jackson Avenue Suite 100
New Orleans, LA 70130
Plaintiff
Broadway Street Holdings, LLC
Eric Oliver Person 1539 Jackson Avenue Suite 100
New Orleans, LA 70130
Plaintiff
Esplanade Avenue Holdings LLC
Eric Oliver Person 1539 Jackson Avenue Suite 100
New Orleans, LA 70130
Plaintiff
Esplanade Avenue Holdings, LLC
Eric Oliver Person 1539 Jackson Avenue Suite 100
New Orleans, LA 70130
Plaintiff
Nidal Jaber
Eric Oliver Person 1539 Jackson Avenue Suite 100
New Orleans, LA 70130
Plaintiff
State Street Nola Investments, LLC
Eric Oliver Person 1539 Jackson Avenue Suite 100
New Orleans, LA 70130
Plaintiff
Webster Street Investments, LLC
Eric Oliver Person 1539 Jackson Avenue Suite 100
New Orleans, LA 70130
Selection Required
Mohamad Saleh
Eric Oliver Person 1539 Jackson Avenue Suite 100
New Orleans, LA 70130


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 05/13 11:08 AM
ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Notice of Removal. InterLinc Mortgage Services, LLC is granted an extension of time through 06/03/2025 to file responsive pleadings to the Plaintiff's Petition. Signed by Judge Darrel James Papillion on 05/13/2025. (ko)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
5 5 misc Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk Fri 05/09 10:00 AM
Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re4 Motion for Extension of Time: Document title and signature block include incorrect party information. All future filings MUST reflect the correct party information throughout the document. Filings which do not reflect the correct party information may not be accepted. (ko)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
4 4 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 05/08 11:48 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Notice of Removal, by Interlinc Mortgage Services LLC.(Byrd, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
3 3 1 pgs order Order Wed 05/07 12:18 PM
Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re1 Notice of Removal. By Clerk.(ko)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Wed 05/07 8:18 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Darrel James Papillion and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (cc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Tue 05/06 5:37 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, case number 2025-02771 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10989622) filed by INTERLINC MORTGAGE SERVICES, LLC.Attorney Timothy G Byrd added to party INTERLINC MORTGAGE SERVICES, LLC(pty:dft).(Byrd, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet