Montana District Court
Judge:Susan P Watters
Case #: 1:25-cv-00063
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Case Filed:May 06, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 5:12 PM MDT
Defendant
Kristopher M. Rivers
Represented By
Brandon JT Hoskins
Moulton Bellingham, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Divine Acquisitions LLC, A New Jersey Limited Liability Company
Represented By
James A. Patten
Patten Peterman Bekkedahl & Green
contact info
Justin M. Oliveira
Patten, Peterman, Bekkedahl & Green PLLC
contact info

GPO May 07 2025
TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. GRANTING 3 Motion for TRO Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/7/2025. (AMC)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/14 4:42 PM
NOTICE by Divine Acquisitions LLC, A New Jersey Limited Liability Company (Patten, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Subpoena
9 9 motion Appear Wed 05/14 4:28 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Remotely . James A. Patten appearing for Plaintiff Divine Acquisitions LLC, A New Jersey Limited Liability Company. (Patten, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearing - SDM Wed 05/14 12:04 PM
Set Hearings: Hearing set for 5/14/2025 at 04:00 PM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. (Setting per SPW Chambers) (EMH)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Wed 05/14 3:40 PM
Terminate Hearings- hearing set for 5/14/2025 at 4:00 PM is vacated per parties request. (EMH)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/12 10:20 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon JT Hoskins on behalf of Kristopher M. Rivers (Hoskins, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings - SDM Fri 05/09 4:56 PM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2025 at 09:00 AM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. (AMC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order on Motion for TRO Wed 05/07 5:08 PM
TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. GRANTING3 Motion for TRO Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/7/2025. (AMC)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 05/07 4:40 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Divine Acquisitions LLC, A New Jersey Limited Liability Company. (Patten, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order Setting Hearing on Motion - SDM Wed 05/07 3:37 PM
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order And Preliminary Injunction filed by Divine Acquisitions LLC, A New Jersey Limited Liability Company Motion Hearing set for 5/20/2025 at 09:00 AM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters.. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 5/7/2025. (AMC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
4 4 minutes Motion Hearing - SDM Tue 05/06 4:53 PM
MINUTE ENTRY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan P. Watters: MOTION FOR HEARING ON TRO held on 5/6/2025 re 3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order And Preliminary Injunction filed by Divine Acquisitions LLC, A New Jersey Limited Liability Company. Representing plaintiff attorneys Andy Patten and Justin Oliviera; representing defendant is attorney Brandon Hoskins. Defense Kris Rivers present at counsel table. Arguments made by both sides. Judge requests counsel to draw up TRO with stipulations. Judge will set a preliminary injunction hearing for Tuesday, May 20th at 9:00 am. Hearing commenced at 3:53 pm and concluded at 4:42 pm. (Court Reporter Kim Marchwick.) (Law Clerk: L. Kimmel), (Hearing held in Billings-SMC) (AMC)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Temporary Restraining Order Tue 05/06 3:16 PM
MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order And Preliminary Injunction . James A. Patten appearing for Plaintiff Divine Acquisitions LLC, A New Jersey Limited Liability Company. (Patten, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed TRO,
Att: 2 Exhibit Stock Purchase Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit Farhi Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit Shareholders Agreement,
Att: 5 Exhibit Notice of Default
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 05/06 3:04 PM
Summons Issued as to Kristopher M. Rivers. Issued summons may be downloaded and printed by counsel for service. (EMH)
Related: [-]
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint - SDM Tue 05/06 3:03 PM
COMPLAINT against Kristopher M. Rivers, filed by Divine Acquisitions LLC, A New Jersey Limited Liability Company. (EMH) (EMH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1. Stock Purchase Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2. Shareholders Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3. Notice of Default
Att: 4 (5/6/2025) Civil Cover Sheet
misc Filing Fee Received Tue 05/06 3:11 PM
Filing fee paid in the shell case: $ 405, receipt number AMTDC-3478024 (EMH)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearing - SDM Tue 05/06 3:59 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 5/6/2025 at 03:30 PM in Billings, MT before Judge Susan P. Watters. (AMC)
Related: [-]