Texas Northern District Court
Judge:David C Godbey
Referred: Brian Mckay
Case #: 3:25-cv-01149
Nature of Suit463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Case Filed:May 06, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 6:12 PM CDT
Defendant
Attorney General Pamela Joe Bondi
US Department of Justice 950 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20530
Defendant
Director Josh Jonhson
Imigration and Customs Enforcement 8101 North Stemmons
Dallas, TX 75247
Defendant
DHS Secretary Kristi Noem
Department of Homeland Security 245 Murray Lane SW Mail Stop 0485
Washington, DC 20528
Petitioner
Pavlo Zinkevych
Bluebonnet Detention Center PO Box 592
Anson, TX 79501
Represented By
Joseph Reina
Reina & Bates Immigration Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
5 5 2 pgs order Order to Show Cause/Order to Answer Thu 05/08 4:30 PM
Order to Show Cause. The clerk has served this order and will regenerate notice of the petition and supporting documents to the designated Assistant US Attorney. Ann Cruce-Haag-DOJ added for Pamela Joe Bondi, Josh Jonhson, and Kristi Noem. (Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Brian McKay on 5/8/2025) (axm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
4 4 misc Remark Wed 05/07 9:44 AM
***The clerk declines to issue summons due to the standard process for Habeas Corpus cases. (ykp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
3 3 qcref Godbey Wed 05/07 9:13 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge McKay (see Special Order 3). Case received over counter or electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the[LINK:national] and[LINK:circuit] indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge McKay). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ykp)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Tue 05/06 5:36 PM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Pavlo Zinkevych. Related [+]
Related: [-] ina, Joseph
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Tue 05/06 5:29 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Pavlo Zinkevych. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. (Filing fee $5; receipt number ATXNDC-15479523) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Related [+]
Related: [-] ina, Joseph
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s)