California Northern District Court
Judge:Nathanael M Cousins
Case #: 5:25-cv-03943
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal
Case Filed:May 06, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of California County of Santa Clara, 25CV462307
Last checked: Tuesday May 06, 2025 5:04 PM PDT
Defendant
Does 1-10, inclusive
Defendant
Timothy K. Jarvis
Defendant
Kinecta Federal Credit Union
Plaintiff
Jenna Minyen
Plaintiff
James Rukstalis


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
6 6 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Wed 05/07 11:15 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 7/30/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2025 10:00 AM in San Jose - To be held by Zoom. (dhm, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Wed 05/07 8:12 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 5/21/2025. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
4 4 service Certificate/Proof of Service Tue 05/06 5:37 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kinecta Federal Credit Union re3 Certificate of Interested Entities,2 Certificate of Interested Entities (Korman, Gregory)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 05/06 5:32 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Kinecta Federal Credit Union (Korman, Gregory)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 05/06 5:30 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Kinecta Federal Credit Union (Notice of Interested Parties) (Korman, Gregory)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 05/06 5:20 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of Santa Clara. Their case number is 25CV462307. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-20647494). Filed by Kinecta Federal Credit Union.(Korman, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A