New York Southern District Court
Judge:Lewis J Liman
Case #: 1:25-cv-03676
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332pr Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 11:08 PM EDT
Defendant
MDC Coastal 1, LLC
Represented By
Andria Simone Kelly
Cullen And Dykman LLP
contact info
Defendant
Stop & Shop Store # 1005921
Represented By
Andria Simone Kelly
Cullen And Dykman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Tanya Goins


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 05/06 9:48 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Andria Simone Kelly to RE-FILE Document No. 3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The PDF is blank;. Re-file the document using the event type Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement found under the event list Other Documents - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed PDF - when prompted with the message "Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?", select the Yes or No radio button - If Yes - enter the corporate parent/other affiliate, click the Search button - select the correct corporate parent/other affiliate name from the search results list or if no person found, create a new corporate parent/other affiliate - select the party to whom the corporate parent/other affiliate should be linked - add corporate parent/other affiliate names one at a time. (lb)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 05/06 3:44 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 05/06 3:44 PM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 05/06 3:44 PM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
5 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kelly, Andria)
Related: [-]
4 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Ahold Delhaize U.S.A., Inc., Corporate Parent AHOLD AMERICAN HOLDINGS, INC. for Stop & Shop Store # 1005921; Corporate Parent Realty Income Corporation for MDC Coastal 1, LLC. Document filed by MDC Coastal 1, LLC, Stop & Shop Store # 1005921..(Kelly, Andria)
Related: [-]
3 3 FILING ERROR - WRONG PDF FILE ASSOCIATED WITH DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Ahold Delhaize U.S.A., Inc., Corporate Parent Ahold America Holdings, Inc. for Stop & Shop Store # 1005921; Corporate Parent Realty Income Corporation for MDC Coastal 1, LLC. Document filed by MDC Coastal 1, LLC, Stop & Shop Store # 1005921..(Kelly, Andria) Modified on 5/6/2025 (lb).
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 812353/2024E. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-31029765).Document filed by MDC Coastal 1, LLC, Stop & Shop Store # 1005921..(Kelly, Andria)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Answer and Initial Discovery Demands,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Bill of Particulars,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Supplemental Bill of Particulars,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E - 250421 plaintiff discovery responses - letter response,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Demand pursuant to 3017 (c),
Att: 7 Exhibit Exhibit G - GF Ltr to PA,
Att: 8 Exhibit Exhibit H - good faith e-mail,
Att: 9 Exhibit Exhibit I 250423 GOINS - RESPONSE to 3017 demand
1 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Kelly, Andria) Modified on 5/5/2025 (gp).
Related: [-]
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Andria Simone Kelly to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 5/12/2025. (gp)
Related: [-]
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Andria Simone Kelly to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The Courthouse Assignment section on the PDF is Blank. Place an X in one Courthouse Assignment box and refile. (gp)
Related: [-]