Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Thomas L Ludington
Referred: Patricia T Morris
Case #: 1:25-cv-11319
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
CauseNo cause code entered
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 1:13 AM EDT
Defendant
Jenn Metzger
Plaintiff
Michael C. Marks, III
2343 N. Smith Street
Sanford, MI 48657


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
misc Pro Se E-filing Access Given Thu 05/08 1:10 PM
Pro Se E-filing Access Given to Michael C. Marks [E-Filer], III. (ABun)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
7 7 cmp Civil Case - Complaint, Amended Thu 05/08 3:14 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Michael C. Marks [E-Filer], III against Jenn Metzger. [SUBMITTED THROUGH PRO SE PORTAL] (NAhm)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Wed 05/07 10:40 AM
ORDER granting2 Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. (KCas)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Regarding Parties Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes* Wed 05/07 8:30 AM
Notice Regarding Parties' Responsibility to Notify Court of Address Changes (CShr)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Wed 05/07 10:40 AM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re6 Order on Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs on Michael C. Marks, III at 2343 N. Smith Street, Sanford, MI 48657. (KCas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
4 4 order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge* Tue 05/06 2:07 PM
ORDER Referring Matters for Full Pretrial to Magistrate Judge Patricia T. Morris. Signed by District Judge Thomas L. Ludington. (KWin)
Related: [-]
service Certificate of Service Tue 05/06 2:09 PM
TEXT-ONLY CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re4 Order Referring Pretrial Matters to Magistrate Judge to Michael C. Marks, III, 2343 N. Smith Street, Sanford, MI 48657. (KWin)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
2 2 petition Application to Proceed Without Prepaying Fees or Costs Tue 05/06 1:03 PM
APPLICATION to Proceed without prepaying fees or costs by Michael C. Marks, III. [Pro Se Document Upload] (JHea)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Tue 05/06 1:02 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Michael C. Marks, III against Jenn Metzger [Pro Se Document Upload] (JHea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet