Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Michael L Brown
Case #: 1:25-cv-02476
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 1:13 AM EDT
Defendant
Nth Degree, Inc.
Plaintiff
Dean Thomas
Represented By
Tyler J. Bean
Siri & Glimstad LLP
contact info
Michael Ross Hirsh
Hirsh Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 81 minutes ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Thu 05/08 6:26 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Cover Sheet, Summons, Letter to Counsel, Standing Order , as to Alisha Smith, CSC COORDINATOR. (Hirsh, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/08 2:38 PM
ORDER granting5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Tyler Bean. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on this 8th day of May, 2025. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(pdt)
Related: [-]
misc Approval of Application for Admission PHV Thu 05/08 10:44 AM
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:5 APPLICATION for Admission of Tyler Bean Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14280903). Attorney Tyler J. Bean added appearing on behalf of DeJean Thomas. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (mh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
5 5 motion Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/07 5:26 PM
APPLICATION for Admission of Tyler Bean Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14280903). with Brief In Support by Dean Thomas. (Hirsh, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
4 4 14 pgs order Order Tue 05/06 12:27 PM
STANDING ORDER regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (jpk)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Letter re:83.1 Tue 05/06 10:56 AM
Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Tyler J. Bean. Clerk to follow-up by 5/16/2025. (jas)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 05/06 10:10 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Nth Degree, Inc. (jkb)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
1 1 47 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 05/06 10:07 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Dean Thomas. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-14273047)(jkb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet