Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:J P Boulee
Case #: 1:25-cv-02484
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 1:14 AM EDT
Defendant
Danny A. Foster
Defendant
Shannon L. Glover
Defendant
Michael Harley
Defendant
Adrian J. Lancaster
Defendant
Kevin Louis-Charles
Defendant
Brian Tolbert
Defendant
Brandon Warren
Defendant
Ryan A. Wright
Plaintiff
Jamei Delaine Todd
Represented By
Cary Stephen Wiggins
Wiggins Law Group, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/07 1:38 PM
NOTICE by Jamei Delaine Todd re1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Wiggins, Cary)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
2 2 30+ pgs order Order Tue 05/06 1:44 PM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge J. P. Boulee on May 6, 2025. (jkl)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/06 10:38 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jamei Delaine Todd. (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-14273860)(dgr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet