Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:William M Ray, II
Referred: Russell G Vineyard
Case #: 1:25-cv-02492
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseFRCP 45(b) Motion to quash or modify subpoena
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Terminated:May 07, 2025
Case in other court:USDC District of Massachusetts, 1:22-cv-12047-PBS
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 4:15 AM EDT
Movant
Christopher Brian Nix
Represented By
Aaron D. Charfoos
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Eric David Stolze
Paul Hastings Llp-Ga
contact info
Plaintiff
Joel Eagelston
Represented By
George V. Granade
Reese Llp-Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
Josh Shi
Represented By
George V. Granade
Reese Llp-Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
Glenn Mulvenna
Represented By
George V. Granade
Reese Llp-Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
Ayana Looney
Represented By
George V. Granade
Reese Llp-Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
Hui Li
Represented By
George V. Granade
Reese Llp-Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
Dan LeFebvre
Represented By
George V. Granade
Reese Llp-Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
R. Andre Klein
Represented By
George V. Granade
Reese Llp-Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
Hustle N Flow Ventures LLC
Represented By
George V. Granade
Reese Llp-Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
Nathan Goldstein
Represented By
George V. Granade
Reese Llp-Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
Amy Doermann
Represented By
George V. Granade
Reese Llp-Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
Sarb Dhesi
Represented By
George V. Granade
Reese Llp-Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services LLC
Represented By
George V. Granade
Reese Llp-Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven Carter
Represented By
George V. Granade
Reese Llp-Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
Noah Bunag
Represented By
George V. Granade
Reese Llp-Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
Eric Brook
Represented By
George V. Granade
Reese Llp-Ca
contact info
Plaintiff
David Andrew
Represented By
George V. Granade
Reese Llp-Ca
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Transfer Case Wed 05/07 1:01 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion to Transfer Case to the US District Court for the District of Massachusetts. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 5/7/2025. (dob)
Related: [-]
Case electronically transferred to District of Massachusetts. (dob) Modified on 5/7/2025 to add text (dob).
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 05/07 1:11 PM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard terminated from case. (dob)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred Out - District Transfer Wed 05/07 1:06 PM
Case electronically transferred to District of Massachusetts. (dob) Modified on 5/7/2025 to add text (dob)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Tue 05/06 11:36 AM
Submission of2 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts, to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
10 10 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re:9 Notice of Filing,, Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Non-Party Christopher Brian Nix's Motion to Quash Subpoena by David Andrew, Eric Brook, Noah Bunag, Steven Carter, Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services LLC, Sarb Dhesi, Amy Doermann, Joel Eagelston, Nathan Goldstein, Hustle N Flow Ventures LLC, R. Andre Klein, Dan LeFebvre, Hui Li, Ayana Looney, Glenn Mulvenna, Josh Shi.(Granade, George)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
9 9 PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE of Filing Plaintiffs' Unredacted Response in Opposition to Non-Party Christopher Brian Nix's Motion to Quash Subpoena by David Andrew, Eric Brook, Noah Bunag, Steven Carter, Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services LLC, Sarb Dhesi, Amy Doermann, Joel Eagelston, Nathan Goldstein, Hustle N Flow Ventures LLC, R. Andre Klein, Dan LeFebvre, Hui Li, Ayana Looney, Glenn Mulvenna, Josh Shi re8 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Granade, George)
Related: [-]
8 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena filed by David Andrew, Eric Brook, Noah Bunag, Steven Carter, Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services LLC, Sarb Dhesi, Amy Doermann, Joel Eagelston, Nathan Goldstein, Hustle N Flow Ventures LLC, R. Andre Klein, Dan LeFebvre, Hui Li, Ayana Looney, Glenn Mulvenna, Josh Shi. (Granade, George)
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE of Appearance by George V. Granade on behalf of David Andrew, Eric Brook, Noah Bunag, Steven Carter, Debt Cleanse Group Legal Services LLC, Sarb Dhesi, Amy Doermann, Joel Eagelston, Nathan Goldstein, Hustle N Flow Ventures LLC, R. Andre Klein, Dan LeFebvre, Hui Li, Ayana Looney, Glenn Mulvenna, Josh Shi (Granade, George)
Related: [-]
utility Case Reported Statistically Tue 05/06 11:31 AM
Case reported statistically. Matter transferred from 1:25-mi-00027. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
6 6 ORDER granting5 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Aaron Charfoos. Signed by Judge William M. Ray, II on 4/22/2025. If the applicant does not have CM/ECF access in the Northern District of Georgia already, they must request access at http://pacer.gov. If they have electronically filed in this district in a previous case, please omit this step.(tmf)
Related: [-]
Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Aaron Charfoos re6 Order on Application for Admission PHV,. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
APPROVAL by Clerks Office re:5 APPLICATION for Admission of Aaron Charfoos Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14234414). Attorney Aaron Charfoos added appearing on behalf of Christopher Brian Nix. E-filing access may be requested after an order granting the application is entered. (esr)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
5 5 APPLICATION for Admission of Aaron Charfoos Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 100, receipt number AGANDC-14234414).by Christopher Brian Nix. (Stolze, Eric) Documents for this entry are not available for viewing outside the courthouse.
Related: [-]
4 4 Letter from Clerk re: LR 83.1 Pro Hac Vice requirements sent to Aaron Charfoos. Clerk to follow-up by 4/28/2025. (jas)
Related: [-]
Submission of1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to Magistrate Judge Russell G. Vineyard. (cpp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
3 3 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Christopher Brian Nix. (cpp)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Transfer Case to the United States District Court for the District of Massachusetts with Memorandum In Support by Christopher Brian Nix.(cpp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Transfer
1 1 MOTION to Quash Subpoena with Memorandum of Law In Support by Christopher Brian Nix.(cpp) (cpp).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Quash,
Att: 2 Declaration in Support of Motion to Quash
Att: 3 (4/18/2025) Civil Cover Sheet
Filing Fee Paid: $ 52, receipt number AGANDC-14231918 (cpp)
Related: [-]