Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Victoria M Calvert
Referred: Linda T Walker
Case #: 1:25-cv-02498
Nature of Suit863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Case Filed:May 06, 2025
Case in other court:Georgia Southern, 1:25-cv-00091
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 4:15 AM EDT
Defendant
Leland Dudek
Represented By
Susan Joan Warren, GOV
Social Security Administration
contact info
Defendant
Eileen Farmer
Represented By
Susan Joan Warren, GOV
Social Security Administration
contact info
Interested Party
Social Security Administration
Interested Party
United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of Georgia
Plaintiff
Demetria Lee
1059 Oglethorpe Ave. SW
Atlanta, GA 30310


Docket last updated: 42 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
utility Submission to Magistrate Judge Wed 05/07 11:45 AM
Submission of6 Amended Complaint for a frivolity determination, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (adg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
9 9 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Tue 05/06 3:17 PM
Case transferred in from District of Georgia Southern; Case Number 1:25-cv-00091. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order Tue 05/06 9:20 AM
ORDER transferring this action to the Northern District of Georgia pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1406(a) and 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 05/06/2025. (jlh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 5/6/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
7 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct1 Complaint SS by Demetria Lee. Responses due by 5/16/2025. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (SLC) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 5/6/2025.]
Related: [-]
6 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Leland Dudek, filed by Demetria Lee. (SLC) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 5/6/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
5 5 ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, subject to objection; and directing Plaintiff to submit an amended complaint within fourteen days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 04/22/2025. (Attachment: #1 Form Pro Se 13 - Complaint for Review of a Social Security Disability or Supplemental Security Income Decision.) (jlh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 5/6/2025.]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Joan Warren on behalf of Social Security Administration (Warren, Susan) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 5/6/2025.]
Related: [-]
Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/6/2025. (jlh) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 5/6/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
3 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Heath Statkus on behalf of Eileen Farmer (Statkus, Shannon) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 5/6/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
2 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Demetria Lee. Responses due by 5/1/2025. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (SLC) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 5/6/2025.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Eileen Farmer This Notice of Electronic Filing constitutes service of the Complaint pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions, filed by Demetria Lee. (SLC) [Transferred from Georgia Southern on 5/6/2025.]
Related: [-]