South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:25-cv-02695
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 31, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 1:18 AM EDT
Defendant
3M Company
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
The Chemours Company
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Defendant
EI DuPont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
13995 Pasteur Boulevard
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
BASF Corporation
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
Plaintiff
Dwayne Coggins
Represented By
Alexandra W Robertson
Ask LLP
contact info
Tessa G Cuneo
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 49 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
3 3 misc MDL Member Case Opened Tue 05/06 2:29 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 3/31/2025), Dwayne Coggins v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:25-cv-02695-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Northern District of Ohio (wmil, )
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 05/06 2:28 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (wmil, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
1 1 42 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 05/06 2:23 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12359634.), filed by Dewayne Coggins. Service due by 6/30/2025(wmil, )
Related: [-]