South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:25-cv-02725
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Apr 01, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 1:21 AM EDT
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc.
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
Defendant
The Chemours Company
individually and as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
Defendant
National Foam, Inc.
141 Junny Road
Angier, NC 27501
Defendant
Kidde PLC
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc.
Defendant
Corteva, Inc.
Defendant
Chubb Fire, Ltd.
Defendant
Chemguard, Inc.
Defendant
ChemDesign Products, Inc.
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
13995 Pasteur Boulevard
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
BASF Corporation
Defendant
Arkema Inc.
Defendant
Archroma U.S., Inc.
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc.
Defendant
3M Company
3M Center
St. Paul, MN 55133
Plaintiff
Joseph Adejare
Represented By
James Caleb Cunningham
Levin Papantonio Rafferty Proctor Buchanan O'Brien Barr
contact info
Madeline Pendley
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
3 3 misc MDL Member Case Opened Tue 05/06 3:02 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(Associated as of 4/1/2025), Joseph Adejare v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:25-cv-02725-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Central District of California (moor)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 05/06 3:01 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (moor)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
1 1 54 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 05/06 3:00 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12362028.), filed by Joseph Adejare. Service due by 6/30/2025(moor)
Related: [-]