Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Jeremy D Kernodle
Case #: 6:25-cv-00160
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:May 06, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 2:05 AM CDT
Defendant
Penn Millers Insurance Company
Plaintiff
Nico DeBoer dba Hilltop Jerseys
Represented By
William W Lundquist
Lundquist Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 15, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/15 9:42 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nico DeBoer dba Hilltop Jerseys. Penn Millers Insurance Company served on 5/8/2025. (Lundquist, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
4 4 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Mon 05/12 2:23 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2) Disclosure Statement identifying party citizenship filed by Nico DeBoer dba Hilltop Jerseys (Lundquist, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
3 3 3 pgs order Order Fri 05/09 11:32 AM
ORDER on Diversity Jurisdiction. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a notice by May 16, 2025, identifying Plaintiff's and Defendant's citizenships in sufficient detail for the Court to determine that the parties satisfy the requirements of diversity jurisdiction under § 1332(a)(1). Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 5/9/2025. (esw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 05/07 9:13 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to Penn Millers Insurance Company. (ndc)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 05/07 3:41 PM
District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle added. (gsm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/06 7:29 PM
COMPLAINT against Penn Millers Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10825010.), filed by Nico DeBoer dba Hilltop Jerseys.(Lundquist, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet