California Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Christopher B Latham
Case #: 3:25-bk-01876
Case Filed:May 06, 2025
Creditor Meeting:Jun 11, 2025

Debtor
CCJG ICHO, LLC
1702 Layne Pl
El Cajon, CA 92019-4265
Represented By
CCJG ICHO, LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Gerald H. Davis
Gerald H. Davis PO Box 38
Aguanga, CA 92536
United States Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee 880 Front Street Suite 3230
San Diego, CA 92101


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 12:01 AM PDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
1 1 2 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)(fee) internal Tue 05/06 11:24 AM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals, Schedules & Statements Fee Amount $ 338.00. Schedules A/B-J due 5/20/2025. State. of Fin. Affairs due 5/20/2025. Summary of Assets and Liabilities and Statistical Info. due 5/20/2025.Corporate Ownership Statement Due: 5/20/2025. Incomplete Filings due by 5/20/2025, Filed by CCJG ICHO, LLC. (Slaughter, S.) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/6/2025 (Slaughter, S.)
Related: [-]
2 2 CASBApi CASB Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 (BUS) Tue 05/06 11:29 AM
Notice of Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of InterimTrustee Davis, Gerald H. with Notice of the Court Regarding Debtors Without Attorney Representation. with Notice of the Court Regarding Debtors Without Attorney Representation. 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/11/2025 at 08:00 AM at via Zoom - Davis Meeting ID 490 058 9288, and Passcode 2108118035, Phone (619) 367-1405. (Slaughter, S.)
Related: [-]
3 3 court Photo Identification for Persons Filing a Petition without Attorney (secured image)(BNC) Tue 05/06 3:00 PM
Photo identification requirement for persons filing a petition without attorney representation. ID checked, petition filed by debtor(s) COURT NOTE: The PDF document is a secured image. (Slaughter, S.)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Errors/Deficiencies (BNC) Tue 05/06 3:18 PM
Notice to Filer of Errors and/or Deficiencies in Documents. Related [+] (Slaughter, S.)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition
5 5 court Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC auto) Tue 05/06 6:00 PM
Receipt of Chapter 7 Filing Fee - $338.00 by BC. Receipt Number 302343. (Admin.)
Related: [-]