California Central District Court
Judge:Percy Anderson
Referred: Jean P Rosenbluth
Case #: 2:25-cv-04059
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 01, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, Los Angeles, 25STCV00072
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 8:10 PM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Officer Quintero
Represented By
Lee H Roistacher
Dean Gazzo Roistacher LLP
contact info
Deborah L. Nash
Dean Gazzo Roistacher LLP
contact info
Defendant
The State of California
a public entity 1782 Grevilla Ave
South Pasadena, CA 91030
Represented By
Lee H Roistacher
Dean Gazzo Roistacher LLP
contact info
Deborah L. Nash
Dean Gazzo Roistacher LLP
contact info
Defendant
Officer Townsend
Represented By
Lee H Roistacher
Dean Gazzo Roistacher LLP
contact info
Deborah L. Nash
Dean Gazzo Roistacher LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
N.A. 1
Represented By
Christian M. Contreras
Law Offices Of Christian Contreras PLC
contact info
Denisse O Gastelum
Gastelum Law, Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
C. A.
Represented By
Christian M. Contreras
Law Offices Of Christian Contreras PLC
contact info
Denisse O Gastelum
Gastelum Law, Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
X. A.
Represented By
Christian M. Contreras
Law Offices Of Christian Contreras PLC
contact info
Denisse O Gastelum
Gastelum Law, Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
A. A. 1
Represented By
Christian M. Contreras
Law Offices Of Christian Contreras PLC
contact info
Denisse O Gastelum
Gastelum Law, Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
A. A. 2
Represented By
Christian M. Contreras
Law Offices Of Christian Contreras PLC
contact info
Denisse O Gastelum
Gastelum Law, Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
N. A. 2
Represented By
Christian M. Contreras
Law Offices Of Christian Contreras PLC
contact info
Denisse O Gastelum
Gastelum Law, Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Filiberto Alvarado
Represented By
Christian M. Contreras
Law Offices Of Christian Contreras PLC
contact info
Denisse O Gastelum
Gastelum Law, Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Estate of Dominick Alvarado
Represented By
Christian M. Contreras
Law Offices Of Christian Contreras PLC
contact info
Denisse O Gastelum
Gastelum Law, Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Shalymmar Pool
Represented By
Christian M. Contreras
Law Offices Of Christian Contreras PLC
contact info
Denisse O Gastelum
Gastelum Law, Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order Fri 05/09 10:05 AM
ORDER REGARDING FILING OF SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT BY PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE by Judge Percy Anderson. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, plaintiffs shall file a second amended complaint within 7 days of this order's date. Defendants' responsive pleading is due 21 days after plaintiffs filing of the second amended complaint. (aco)
Related: [-]
12 12 minutes Status Conference - optional html form Fri 05/09 10:03 AM
MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Percy Anderson. Court and counsel confer regarding the status of the case, discovery, and the parties' Stipulation Regarding Filing of Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs and Defendants' Response (Docket No. 4 (Stipulation)). Plaintiffs' counsel confirms that the contemplated Second Amended Complaint will not add any new claims or parties. Court Reporter: Phyllis Preston. (aco)
Related: [-]
9 9 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Thu 05/08 9:11 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Percy Anderson. Status Conference by ZOOM is set for 5/8/2025 at 02:30 PM before Judge Percy Anderson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kss)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
11 11 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Thu 05/08 9:39 AM
SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16, 26(f)] by Judge Percy Anderson. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for June 23, 2025, at 10:30 a.m. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held Thu 05/08 9:33 AM
STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 05/06 4:23 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 05/06 4:22 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 05/06 4:22 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 transfer Intradistrict Transfer - Clerical Error (G-73) - optional html form Tue 05/06 4:08 PM
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Western Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Jean P. Rosenbluth. New Case Number 2:25-cv-04059-PA (JPRx). (car)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
4 4 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response filed by Defendants Officer Quintero, The State of California, Officer Townsend.(Roistacher, Lee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Thursday, May 01, 2025
3 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Officer Quintero, The State of California, Officer Townsend.(Roistacher, Lee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
2 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Officer Quintero, The State of California, Officer Townsend, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,1 served on May 1, 2025. (Roistacher, Lee)
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, Los Angeles, case number 25STCV00072 Receipt No: ACACDC-39616753 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendants Officer Townsend, Officer Quintero, The State of California. (Attorney Lee H Roistacher added to party Officer Quintero(pty:dft), Attorney Lee H Roistacher added to party The State of California(pty:dft), Attorney Lee H Roistacher added to party Officer Townsend(pty:dft))(Roistacher, Lee)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - ADR Package,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Civil Case Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Case Assignment,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Peremptory Challenge,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge - POS,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Notice of Case Reassignment,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Notice of CMC 05 06 2025,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11 - Notice of CMC 05 15 2025,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12 - OSC 03 11 2025 Re Failure to File POS,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13 - OSC 05 06 2025 Re Failure to File POS,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 - FAC,
Att: 15 Exhibit 15 - 03 06 2025 Minute Order Re Non Appearance Case Review,
Att: 16 Exhibit 16 - Clerk's Certificate of Mail - Non Appearance Case Review,
Att: 17 Exhibit 17 - App GAL Re A.A. 1,
Att: 18 Exhibit 18 -App GAL Re A.A. 2,
Att: 19 Exhibit 19 - App GAL Re C.A.,
Att: 20 Exhibit 20 - App GAL Re N.A. 1,
Att: 21 Exhibit 21 - App GAL Re N.A. 2,
Att: 22 Exhibit 22 - App GAL Re X.A.,
Att: 23 Exhibit 23 - Prop Order GAL Re A.A. 1,
Att: 24 Exhibit 24 - Prop Order GAL Re A.A. 2,
Att: 25 Exhibit 25 - Prop Order GAL Re C.A.,
Att: 26 Exhibit 26 - Prop Order GAL Re N.A. 1,
Att: 27 Exhibit 27 - Prop Order GAL Re N.A. 2,
Att: 28 Exhibit 28 - Prop Order GAL Re X.A.,
Att: 29 Exhibit 29 - Proof of Service of Summons Re Officer Quintero,
Att: 30 Exhibit 30 - Proof of Service of Summons Re Officer Townsend,
Att: 31 Exhibit 31 - Proof of Service of Summons Re State of California
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Tue 05/06 4:36 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10, individually, Officer Quintero, The State of California, Officer Townsend. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs N.A., A.A. 1, A.A. 2, N.A, X.A., Shalymmar Pool, Filiberto Alvarado, Estate of Dominick Alvarado. Filed in State Court on 1/2/2025 Submitted with Attachment 1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
othcmp Amended Complaint Tue 05/06 4:55 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10, individually, Officer Quintero, The State of California, Officer Townsend amending Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Plaintiffs X. A., A. A. 1, C. A., Filiberto Alvarado, N.A. 1, Shalymmar Pool, A. A. 2, Estate of Dominick Alvarado, N. A. 2. Filed in State Court on 3/4/2025 Submitted with Attachment 14 Exhibit 14 to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 05/06 5:11 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs upon Defendant Officer Townsend served on 4/1/2025, answer due 4/22/2025. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Filed in State Court on 4/7/2025 Submitted with Attachment 30 Exhibit 30 to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 05/06 5:19 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs upon Defendant The State of California served on 4/1/2025, answer due 4/22/2025. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Filed in State Court on 4/7/2025 Submitted with Attachment 31 Exhibit 31 to Notice of Removal1 (car)
Related: [-]
CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs upon Defendant Officer Quintero served on 4/1/2025, answer due 4/22/2025. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy Filed in State Court on 4/7/2025 Submitted with Attachment 29 Exhibit 29 to Notice of Removal1 (car) Modified on 5/6/2025 (car).
Related: [-]