California Central District Court
Judge:Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpo
Referred: David T Bristow
Case #: 5:25-cv-01051
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 25, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
3 3 notice Notice of Reference to US Magistrate Judge (CV-25) - optional html form Tue 05/06 11:36 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
2 2 notice Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint (CV-93P) Tue 05/06 11:33 AM
Notice Re: Discrepancies in Filing of Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint (CV-93P). Upon submission of your civil rights complaint, it was noted that you did not pay the appropriate filing fee. If you are unable to pay the entire filing fee at this time, you must sign and complete the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support form (CV-60P) attached. You may return your fee waiver and/or payment to any of the Courthouses listed on this notice. If you do not respond within THIRTY DAYS from the date below, your action may be dismissed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Prisoner Civil Rights) Tue 05/06 11:32 AM
CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Jose Wilson Guzman against Defendants California Court of Appeals, California Supreme Court and Riverside California Superior Court, pursuant to 42 USC 1983. Case assigned to Judge Maame Ewusi-Mensah Frimpong and referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Bristow. (jtil)
Related: [-]