California Eastern District Court
Judge:Sheila K Oberto
Case #: 1:25-cv-00525
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Case Filed:May 05, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
3 3 order Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider Tue 05/06 12:27 PM
PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED. Consent or Decline due by 6/9/2025. (Deputy Clerk CRM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
2 2 order 05 - HC/Order Authorizing IFP Tue 05/06 12:27 PM
ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Juan Sandoval-Pasos signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/6/2025. (Deputy Clerk CRM)
Related: [-]
service Service by Mail Tue 05/06 12:29 PM
SERVICE BY MAIL:3 Prisoner New Case Documents,2 Order Authorizing IFP Status served on Juan Sandoval-Pasos. (Deputy Clerk CRM)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Tue 05/06 12:21 PM
(2241) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against T. Taylor by Juan Sandoval-Pasos. (Deputy Clerk CRM)
Related: [-]