Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:25-mb-01212
Case Filed:Feb 06, 2025
Terminated:Feb 06, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 1:13 AM MST
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Search Warrant (1)
Terminated: 02/06/2025


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 4:47 AM MST
Thursday, February 06, 2025
1 1 SEARCH AND SEIZURE WARRANT ISSUED for Cellular Telephone: Samsung, IMEI# 351783152009565. Ross Arellano Edwards appearing for USA. (MAP)
Related: [-]