California Northern District Court
Judge:Eumi K Lee
Referred: Virginia K Demarchi
Case #: 5:25-cv-03918
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 05, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 1:13 AM PDT
Defendant
Campbell Police Department
Defendant
City of Santa Clara
Wilke Fleury LLP 621 Capitol Mall Suite 900
Sacramento, CA 95814
Defendant
Santa Clara Police Department
Defendant
Santa Clara Sheriff's Office
Plaintiff
Pawl Washeleski
1835 Grant Street
Santa Clara, CA 95050


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
22 22 oth_sup Declaration in Support Fri 05/09 10:55 AM
Declaration of Discovery filed byPawl Washeleski. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
21 21 oth_sup Supplemental Brief Fri 05/09 10:53 AM
Supplemental Brief filed byPawl Washeleski. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
20 20 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Fri 05/09 8:35 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES FOLLOWING REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 7/30/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/13/2025 01:30 AM before Judge Eumi K. Lee in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lrt, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
19 19 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 05/08 11:11 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is directly assigned to Judge Eumi K Lee. Judge Beth Labson Freeman no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs order Order Relating Case Thu 05/08 10:17 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER. Case No. 5:25-cv-3918-BLF is related to Case No. 5:25-cv-3135-EKL and shall be reassigned to Judge Eumi K. Lee. Signed by Judge Eumi K. Lee on 5/8/2025. (lrt, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge for Discovery Thu 05/08 11:11 AM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi for Discovery. (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
17 17 oth_sup Declaration in Support Wed 05/07 4:12 PM
Declaration of Notice and Liability filed byPawl Washeleski. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order Wed 05/07 9:11 AM
SUA SPONTE JUDICIAL REFERRAL FOR PURPOSE OF DETERMINING RELATIONSHIP OF CASES. Signed by Judge Beth Labson Freeman on 5/7/2025. (blflc3, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
16 16 misc Statement Wed 05/07 9:54 AM
Supplemental Statement of Retraumatizationand Civil Rights Compounding by Pawl Washeleski. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Statement Wed 05/07 9:50 AM
Supplemental Statement of Harm re4 MOTION by Pawl Washeleski. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/07 9:48 AM
Supplement to Civil Rights Claim by Pawl Washeleski (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/07 9:40 AM
Supplemental NOTICE by Pawl Washeleski (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
11 11 misc Statement Tue 05/06 6:41 PM
Supplemental Statement of Harm and ADA Impact by Pawl Washeleski. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Statement Tue 05/06 6:39 PM
Statement of Facts by Pawl Washeleski. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Request Tue 05/06 6:37 PM
Request for Accommodation & Protection by Pawl Washeleski. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 oth_sup Request for Judicial Notice Tue 05/06 6:35 PM
Request for Judicial Notice filed byPawl Washeleski. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge Tue 05/06 6:33 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Pawl Washeleski. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 oth_sup Declaration in Support Tue 05/06 6:32 PM
Declaration of Harm - False Arrest (2013) filed byPawl Washeleski. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
5 5 oth_sup Declaration in Support Tue 05/06 6:31 PM
Declaration of Denial of Access filed byPawl Washeleski. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 05/06 6:29 PM
Emergency MOTION filed by Pawl Washeleski. Responses due by 5/19/2025. Replies due by 5/27/2025. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 05/06 6:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Pawl Washeleski. (hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 05/06 6:25 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See [LINK:General Order 65] and [LINK:cand.uscourts.gov/cameras] . Case Management Statement due by 7/31/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/7/2025 11:00 AM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (hdj, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/06 6:22 PM
COMPLAINT against Campbell Police Department, City of Santa Clara, Santa Clara Police Department, Santa Clara Sheriff's Office. Filed by Pawl Washeleski.(hdj, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 case summary,
Att: 3 cover letter,
Att: 4 Certificate/Proof of Service