Nevada District Court
Judge:Elayna J Youchah
Case #: 2:25-cv-00794
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 06, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 1:16 AM PDT
Defendant
Kearns Technology Inc.
Plaintiff
The 361 Venture, LLC
Represented By
Joseph G. Went
Holland & Hart LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 05/09 9:33 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kearns Technology Inc. re1 Complaint. (RJDG)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Option to Decline MJ - FORM Fri 05/09 9:31 AM
OPTION TO DECLINE MAGISTRATE JUDGE OVERSEEING YOUR CASE. The attached form must be filed in the docket or received by the Clerk within 21 days of your first appearance in the case should you choose to decline consent. (A copy of the form has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (RJDG)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc General Orders regarding MJ assignment Fri 05/09 9:30 AM
GENERAL ORDER 2023-11 IN RE: CONSENT AND REFERRALS TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGES UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 636. (A copy of the General Order has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (RJDG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
1 1 9 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 05/06 5:37 PM
COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $405 receipt number BNVDC-8042847) by The 361 Venture, LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 5/16/2025. Proof of service due by 8/4/2025. (Went, Joseph) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Kearns Technology Inc.
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Fri 05/09 9:30 AM
Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (RJDG)
Related: [-]