Original Case: 1:23-cv-06024

Eleventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-prici-11529
Typeprivate civil / federal question
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Case Filed:May 02, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 4:29 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
POSTMASTER GENERAL
Represented By
U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Georgia
DOJ-USAO
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE
Represented By
U.S. Attorney Service - Northern District of Georgia
DOJ-USAO
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
BRIAN HOWARD
Represented By
Brian Howard
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 4:29 AM EDT
Friday, May 02, 2025
CIVIL APPEAL DOCKETED. Notice of appeal filed by Appellant Brian Howard on 05/02/2025. Fee Status: Fee Not Paid. Awaiting Appellant's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 05/27/2025 as to Appellant Brian Howard. Awaiting Appellee's Certificate of Interested Persons due on or before 06/03/2025 as to Appellee Postmaster General.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs CIVIL - Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 5 pgs Civil Appeal Docketed - Notice of Appeal
Att: 3 1 pgs USDC Order 37
Att: 4 1 pgs USDC Judgment 38