Original Case: 1:24-cv-05743

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01775
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 06, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 7:19 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
DANIEL R. DEGNAN, Judge
Represented By
Frank Henry Bieszczat
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JERMAINE APPLEWHITE
Represented By
Jermaine Applewhite
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 6:48 AM CDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
1 1 Private civil case docketed. IFP. Docketing Statement due for Appellant Jermaine Applewhite by 05/12/2025. Transcript information sheet due by 05/20/2025. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/16/2025 for Jermaine Applewhite. [1] [7450709] 25-1775 (PS) [Entered: 05/06/2025 12:47 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 9 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court