Original Case: 1:23-cv-01865

Seventh Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01776
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Case Filed:May 06, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 7:19 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
INDIANA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Represented By
Thomas S. Pratt
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
WILLIAM T. GEIBEL
Represented By
Thomas S. Pratt
OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
KEISHA L. LEWIS
Represented By
Jeffrey A. Macey
MACEY SWANSON LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 6:48 AM CDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
1 1 Private civil case docketed. Fee paid. Docketing statement filed. Transcript information sheet due by 05/20/2025. Appellant's brief due on or before 06/16/2025 for Keisha L. Lewis. [1] [7450717] 25-1776 (PS) [Entered: 05/06/2025 01:15 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 61 pgs Civil Case
Att: 2 2 pgs Attorney / Party Notice of Docketing
Att: 3 1 pgs Notice to District Court