Original Case: 4:25-cv-00492

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01906
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 06, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 3:51 AM CDT
Defendant - Appellee
Price Self Storage West LA LLC
Plaintiff - Appellant
Cedric Greene, Jr.
Represented By
Cedric Greene Jr.
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Valerie Stephen
Represented By
Valerie Stephen
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 3:51 AM CDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
3 pgs Civil case docketed. [5514013] 25-1906 (CMH)
Related: [-]
11 pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Memorandum & Order 04/2/2025, Order of Dismissal 04/22/2025, and Order 04/29/2025. [5514015] 25-1906 (CMH)
Related: [-]
1 pgs CLERK ORDER: The $605 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to either pay the fee in the district court or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the district court within 21 days of the date of this order. If appellant does not pay the fee or move for IFP status by 05/27/2025, a show cause order will be entered directing the appellant to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. [5514018] 25-1906 (CMH)
Related: [-]
1 pgs CLERK ORDER: If the original file of the United States District Court is available for review in electronic format, the court will rely on the electronic version of the record in its review. The appendices required by Eighth Circuit Rule 30A shall not be required. In accordance with Eighth Circuit Local Rule 30A(a)(2), the Clerk of the United States District Court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER, including any documents maintained in paper format or filed under seal, exhibits, administrative records and state court files. These documents should be submitted within 10 days. [5514022] 25-1906 (CMH)
Related: [-]