Michigan Western District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-00047
Case Filed:Apr 15, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 08, 2025 3:15 AM EDT
defendant
Jason Daniel Freiberg (1)
Represented By
Samuel Roddy
Federal Public Defender (grand Rapids)
contact info
plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Timothy Peter VerHey
U.S. Attorney (grand Rapids)
contact info

GPO May 05 2025
ORDER OF DETENTION pending trial as to defendant Jason Daniel Freiberg; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (ald)

Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 4:00 AM EDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
1 1 (RESTRICTED ACCESS) INDICTMENT as to Jason Daniel Freiberg [Access to this document is available to the Court and attorney(s) for Jason Daniel Freiberg, USA only] (mlc) Modified text on 4/18/2025 (bjg).
Related: [-]
2 2 INDICTMENT (REDACTED) as to Jason Daniel Freiberg (mlc) Modified text on 4/18/2025 (bjg).
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION and ORDER TO SEAL CASE until defendant is arrested, the investigation is completed, or further order of this court; signed by Magistrate Judge Ray Kent (mlc) Modified text on 4/18/2025 (bjg).
Related: [-]
5 5 PENALTY SHEET re Indictment1 as to Jason Daniel Freiberg (mlc) Modified text on 4/18/2025 (bjg).
Related: [-]