Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 4:25-cv-02055
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1335 Interpleader Action
Case Filed:May 07, 2025
Case in other court:Texas Western, 1:24-cv-01085
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 8:04 AM CDT
Cross Claimant
Balkees Abderrahman
Represented By
Samuel Loyd Neal, III
S. Loyd Neal, Iii/the Neal Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Cross Claimant
Alexandra K.L. Noel
Represented By
Andrew James Noel
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Debra Lynn Bradberry
Henneman Rau & Kirklin LLP
contact info
Marcus Wayne Waters
Ford Bergner LLP
contact info
Cross Claimant
Helen M.Y. Turner
Represented By
Andrew James Noel
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Debra Lynn Bradberry
Henneman Rau & Kirklin LLP
contact info
Marcus Wayne Waters
Ford Bergner LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
Balkees Abderrahman
Represented By
Samuel Loyd Neal, III
S. Loyd Neal, Iii/the Neal Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Cross Defendant
Alexandra K.L. Noel
Represented By
Andrew James Noel
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Debra Lynn Bradberry
Henneman Rau & Kirklin LLP
contact info
Marcus Wayne Waters
Ford Bergner LLP
contact info
Cross Defendant
Helen M.Y. Turner
Represented By
Andrew James Noel
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Debra Lynn Bradberry
Henneman Rau & Kirklin LLP
contact info
Marcus Wayne Waters
Ford Bergner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Balkees Abderrahman
Represented By
Samuel Loyd Neal, III
S. Loyd Neal, Iii/the Neal Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Alexandra K.L. Noel
Represented By
Andrew James Noel
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Debra Lynn Bradberry
Henneman Rau & Kirklin LLP
contact info
Marcus Wayne Waters
Ford Bergner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Helen M.Y. Turner
Represented By
Andrew James Noel
Robins Kaplan LLP
contact info
Debra Lynn Bradberry
Henneman Rau & Kirklin LLP
contact info
Marcus Wayne Waters
Ford Bergner LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Plaintiff
Dearborn Life Insurance Company
Terminated: 05/04/2025
Represented By
Andrew Fairles MacRae
Macrae Law Firm PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 8:20 AM CDT
Thursday, September 12, 2024
Case assigned to Judge Docket II - Austin. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin Howell. (kp)
Related: [-]
1 1 59 pgs COMPLAINT in Interpleader ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19221440). No Summons requested at this time, filed by Dearborn Life Insurance Company d/b/a Blue Cross Blue Shield of Texas.(MacRae, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
2 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Dearborn Life Insurance Company. (MacRae, Andrew)
Related: [-]
3 3 Summons Issued as to Balkees Abderrahman. (dm)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
4 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dearborn Life Insurance Company as to Balkees Abderrahman. Waiver sent on 9/12/2024, answer due 11/12/2024. (MacRae, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 14, 2024
5 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dearborn Life Insurance Company as to Alexandra K.L. Noel. Waiver sent on 9/13/2024, answer due 11/12/2024. (MacRae, Andrew)
Related: [-]
6 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dearborn Life Insurance Company as to Helen M.Y. Turner. Waiver sent on 9/13/2024, answer due 11/12/2024. (MacRae, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
7 7 Defendant Balkees Abderrahman's Original ANSWER to1 Complaint, and Request for Declaratory Judgment . Attorney S. Loyd Neal, III added to party Balkees Abderrahman(pty:dft), CROSSCLAIM against Alexandra K.L. Noel, Helen M.Y. Turner by Balkees Abderrahman.(Neal, S.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
8 8 ANSWER to1 Complaint, . Attorney Debra Bradberry added to party Alexandra K.L. Noel(pty:dft), Attorney Debra Bradberry added to party Helen M.Y. Turner(pty:dft) by Alexandra K.L. Noel, Helen M.Y. Turner.(Bradberry, Debra)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
9 9 ANSWER to7 Answer to Complaint,, Crossclaim, , CROSSCLAIM against Balkees Abderrahman by Helen M.Y. Turner, Alexandra K.L. Noel.(Bradberry, Debra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
10 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Debra Bradberry on behalf of Alexandra K.L. Noel, Helen M.Y. Turner (Bradberry, Debra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
11 11 Agreed MOTION to Deposit Funds by Dearborn Life Insurance Company.(MacRae, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, January 27, 2025
12 12 AGREED INTERPLEADER ORDERS. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (dm)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
13 13 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Alan D Albright for all proceedings. Judge Docket II - Austin no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (bot1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
14 14 Rule 26(f) Discovery Report/Case Management Plan Agreed Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan by Balkees Abderrahman, Alexandra K.L. Noel, Helen M.Y. Turner. (Neal, S.)
Related: [-]
15 15 MOTION to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order by Balkees Abderrahman.(Neal, S.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
16 16 Proposed Protective Order by Balkees Abderrahman. (Neal, S.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
Text Order MOOTING15 Dr. Balkees Abderrahman's Motion to Quash Subpoena and for Protective Order in light of16 Stipulation for Withdrawal of Subpoena and Motion to Quash entered by Judge Alan D Albright. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jglc)
Related: [-]
17 17 STIPULATION for Withdrawal of Subpoena and Motion to Quash by Alexandra K.L. Noel, Helen M.Y. Turner. (Noel, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
18 18 Receipt of Deposit ($424,000.00); re:12 Agreed Interpleader Orders by Dearborn Life Insurance Company. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
19 19 ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Dearborn Life Insurance Company . (MacRae, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
20 20 MOTION to Change Venue by Consent of the Parties by Alexandra K.L. Noel, Helen M.Y. Turner. (Noel, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 04, 2025
21 21 ORDER OF DISMISSAL as to Dearborn Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 05, 2025
Notice: Pursuant to the Court's Order (Dkt.12 ), the Court will realign the remaining parties at a later date. (cnr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
22 22 ORDER GRANTING20 Motion to Change Venue. It is Ordered that the case is Transferred to the Houston Division of the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Texas. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (dm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
23 23 Case transferred in from Texas Western. Case Number 1:24-cv-01085; certified copy of transfer order, certified docket sheet, and transfer letter received
Related: [-]