Connecticut District Court
Judge:Alvin W Thompson
Case #: 3:25-cv-00737
Nature of Suit310 Torts - Personal Injury - Airplane
Cause49:1471 Federal Aviation Act
Case Filed:May 07, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 10:05 AM EDT
Defendant
Connecticut Airport Authority
Defendant
G2 Secure Staff, LLC
Defendant
Jetblue Airways Corporation
Represented By
Steven E. Arnold
Sa Law, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Benjamin Parish
Plaintiff
Kathleen Leclair


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/09 10:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward N. Storck, III on behalf of Connecticut Airport Authority, Benjamin Parish (Storck, Edward)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
12 12 order Electronic Service Documents Wed 05/07 4:35 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES: Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of6 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 12, 2025 to Plead1 Notice of Removal,, filed by G2 Secure Staff L.L.C.,5 Disclosure Statement filed by Jetblue Airways Corporation,10 Standing Protective Order,1 Notice of Removal,, filed by Jetblue Airways Corporation,8 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, 7 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,2 Notice of Appearance filed by Jetblue Airways Corporation,9 Electronic Filing Order,11 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction,3 Notice (Other) filed by Jetblue Airways Corporation,4 Notice (Other) filed by Jetblue Airways Corporation. Signed by Clerk on 5/7/25. (Velez, F)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order on Removed Cases
11 11 misc Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake) Wed 05/07 4:30 PM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Velez, F)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Wed 05/07 4:29 PM
Standing Protective Order. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 5/7/25. (Velez, F)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Electronic Filing Order Wed 05/07 4:28 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 5/7/25.(Velez, F)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Wed 05/07 4:28 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 7/7/2025; Discovery due by 11/6/2025; Dispositive Motions due by 12/11/2025. Signed by Clerk on 5/7/25. (Velez, F)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Wed 05/07 11:35 AM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(b), a disclosure statement required under Rule 7.1(a) must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 5/7/2025.(Maturo, F.)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extension of Time Wed 05/07 11:34 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time until May 12, 2025 to Plead1 Notice of Removal, by G2 Secure Staff L.L.C. (Maturo, F.)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement Wed 05/07 10:09 AM
Disclosure Statement by Jetblue Airways Corporation. (Arnold, Steven)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/07 10:07 AM
NOTICE by Jetblue Airways Corporation of pending state court motions (Arnold, Steven)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/07 10:05 AM
NOTICE by Jetblue Airways Corporation Certificate of Filing and Service of Notice of Removal with State Court(Arnold, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of filing Notice of Removal with State Court
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/07 9:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E. Arnold on behalf of Jetblue Airways Corporation (Arnold, Steven)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 05/07 9:47 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Jetblue Airways Corporation from Hartford Superior Court, case number HHD-CV25-6198485-S. Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACTDC-8159805, filed by Jetblue Airways Corporation.(Arnold, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - State Court Writ, Summons & Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Return of Service,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - JetBlue Request to Revise Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - P's Revised Complaint,
Att: 6 Exhibit E - State Court Docket Entries
utility NEW Case Assignment Wed 05/07 3:37 PM
CASE ASSIGNMENT: District Judge Alvin W. Thompson assigned to the case. If the District Judge issues an Order of Referral to a Magistrate Judge for any matter other than settlement, the matter will be referred to Magistrate Judge S. Dave Vatti. (Freberg, B)
Related: [-]