Texas Northern District Court
Judge:James Wesley Hendrix
Case #: 1:25-cv-00074
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Case Filed:May 06, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
4 4 order Order And Notice of Deficiency Wed 05/07 3:59 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER AND NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: Petitioner did not pay the required filing fee or file a request to proceed in forma pauperis . Therefore, Petitioner is ORDERED to pay the $5.00 filing fee or file an application to proceed in forma pauperis with the required certified statement of resident trust account by June 9, 2025 (30 days). Petitioner's failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this action pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b) . The Clerk is directed to provide to Petitioner, with service of this order, a form application to proceed in forma pauperis and a certificate of inmate trust account. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 5/7/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Wed 05/07 10:00 AM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (skh)
Related: [-]
2 2 qcref Hendrix Wed 05/07 9:58 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. (skh)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Wed 05/07 10:02 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:3. mailed to Idoko Hillary Chibueze at Bluebonnet Detention Center on Wed May 7 10:02:36 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
utility Modify Hearings/Deadlines (Optional) Wed 05/07 4:34 PM
Hearing/Deadline Modification: Deadline set per 4 Electronic Order And Notice of Deficiency. Deadline to cure the deficiency is 6/9/2025. (skh)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Wed 05/07 4:34 PM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:4. mailed to Idoko Hillary Chibueze Bluebonnet Detention Center Wed May 7 16:34:28 CDT 2025 (crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Wed 05/07 9:55 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Idoko Hillary Chibueze. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (skh) Modified filing date on 5/7/2025 (skh). (Attachment 1 replaced after rotating and removing blank pages on 5/7/2025) (grl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s),
Att: 2 Additional Page(s)