Hill v. Range et al
Illinois Central District Court | |
Judge: | Sue E Myerscough |
Referred: | Douglas J Quivey |
Case #: | 4:25-cv-04093 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | May 06, 2025 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, May 12, 2025 | ||
order
Order Assigning Referral Judge
Mon 05/12 5:25 PM
|
||
Thursday, May 08, 2025 | ||
order
Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 05/08 10:50 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by District Judge Sue E Myerscough on 5/8/2025. Plaintiff has filed only a Motion for Emergency Injunctive Relief1 . However, "[a] civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the court." Fed. R. Civ. P. 3. Plaintiff is granted 21 days in which to file a Complaint. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of this action without prejudice.(VH) |
||
Wednesday, May 07, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() TEXT ORDER entered by District Judge Sue E Myerscough on 5/7/2025. Plaintiff has filed a new case but has not paid the $405 filing fee nor filed a petition to proceed in forma pauperis. Within 21 days of the entry of this order, Plaintiff must pay the $405 filing fee in full or file a petition to proceed in forma pauperis with attached trust fund ledgers for the last 6 months. Failure to comply without good cause will result in dismissal of this case without prejudice, and the Plaintiff will still be responsible for payment of the filing fee. See 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1914. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis.(SAG) |
|
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Sue E Myerscough. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Springfield Division, 600 E Monroe, Springfield,IL 62701.Merit Review Deadline set for 5/27/2025.(SAG) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, May 06, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() MOTION for Emergency Injunctive Relief by Plaintiff Demeco Hill. Responses due by 5/20/2025 (SAG) |