Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Eldon E Fallon
Referred: Janis Van Meerveld
Case #: 2:25-cv-00891
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 07, 2025
Case in other court:24th Judicial District Court, Parish of Jefferson, 859919 "C"
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 12:09 PM CDT
Defendant
"XYZ" Employee
Defendant
Sam's Club
Defendant
Sam's East, Inc.
Represented By
Isidro Rene' Derojas
Mccranie, Sistrunk, Anzelmo, Hardy, Mcdaniel & Welch (n.O.)
contact info
Defendant
Wal-Mart, Inc.
Plaintiff
Mayra Munguia Bueno


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order Set Hearings Wed 05/14 10:47 AM
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2025 at 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(jls)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Thu 05/08 3:05 PM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Lance M Africk recused. Case reassigned to Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 05/08/2025. (NEF: Section L) (ko)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 05/08 12:00 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Lance M Africk. Judge Jane Triche Milazzo no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 05/08/2025.(go) (NEF-Section I)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
3 3 1 pgs order Order Wed 05/07 3:28 PM
Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Sam's East, Inc. (go)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Initial Case Assignment Wed 05/07 11:41 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 05/07 11:36 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 24th JDC, case number 859919 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ALAEDC-10990325) filed by Sam's East, Inc.Attorney Isidro Rene' Derojas added to party Sam's East, Inc.(pty:dft).(Derojas, Isidro)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Petition for Damages,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Amended and Supp Petition,
Att: 4 Exhibit C- Citation Return,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Sam's Answer, RFN, JO