New York Southern District Court
Judge:Katherine Polk Failla
Case #: 1:25-cv-03802
Nature of Suit895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act
Cause05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Case Filed:May 07, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 1:09 PM EDT
Defendant
U.S. Department of State
U.S. Department of State 600 19th Street, Suite 5.600
Washington, DC 20522
Plaintiff
Alice Speri
Represented By
Amber Qureshi
Law Office Of Amber Qureshi, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/09 10:03 AM
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting4 Motion for Amber Qureshi to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the pending motion at docket entry 4. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 5/9/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 05/08 10:00 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to U.S. Department of State..(gp)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Thu 05/08 9:58 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Thu 05/08 9:59 AM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Thu 05/08 9:59 AM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 05/07 1:10 PM
MOTION for Amber Qureshi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-31045544. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Alice Speri..(Qureshi, Amber)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice,
Att: 2 Exhibit MD Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Exhibit DC Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 4 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Wed 05/07 1:04 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to U.S. Department of State, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Alice Speri..(Qureshi, Amber)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 05/07 1:00 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Qureshi, Amber)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/07 12:57 PM
COMPLAINT against U.S. Department of State. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-31045453)Document filed by Alice Speri..(Qureshi, Amber)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - FOIA Request from Plaintiff Speri,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Acknowledgment Letter from DOS,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Plaintiffs Appeal,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Email from DOS
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Wed 05/07 2:00 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 4 MOTION for Amber Qureshi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-31045544. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
Related: [-]