PIVOT Operations LLC
Idaho Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Whitman L Holt |
Case #: | 1:25-bk-00331 |
Case Filed: | May 07, 2025 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $500,001 to $1 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
PIVOT Operations LLC
1290 W Myrtle St Ste 150
Boise, ID 83702-6945 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
550 West Fort St, Ste 698
Boise, ID 83724 |
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:01 PM MDT |
Tuesday, May 13, 2025 | ||
26 | 26
![]() Order Granting Motion To Pay and Granting Motion to Shorten Time Signed on 5/13/2025. (ck) |
|
25 | 25
court
Minute Entry Hearing Held (Other)
Tue 05/13 4:16 PM
Hearing Held Appearances: Sheila Schwager Attorney for Citizens Community Bank; Matthew Christensen Attorney for Debtor, Brett Cahoon US Report of Proceedings: After a discussion with parties and with no objections, the Court will APPROVE the Motion to Pay Dkt#8 is deemed appropriate. The Court will also APPROVE Dkt#12 Motion to Shorten Time. Mr. Christensen is to submit an order as to the terms stated on the record. Audio File Location: Zoom-Telephone (dj) |
|
Monday, May 12, 2025 | ||
24 | 24
![]() Notice of Appearance by Amber Nicole Dina Filed by Creditor Bill Bright Properties-SR, LLC. (Dina, Amber) |
|
Saturday, May 10, 2025 | ||
23 | 23
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Notice Date 05/10/2025. (Admin.) |
|
22 | 22
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 05/10/2025. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 09, 2025 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Notice of Appearance by Devin Bray Filed by Creditor Citizens Community Bank. (Bray, Devin) |
|
20 | 20
![]() Notice of Appearance by Sheila Rae Schwager Filed by Creditor Citizens Community Bank. (Schwager, Sheila) |
|
Thursday, May 08, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Corporate parents added to case: Kristin Armstrong Academy LLC. Filed by Debtor PIVOT Operations LLC. (Christensen, Matthew) |
|
18 | 18
![]() Notice of Telephonic Hearing (Chapter 11, Subchapter V Status Conference), and Order . Status hearing to be held on 6/17/2025 at 02:30 PM at Telephonic Hearing. (ck) |
|
17 | 17
![]() Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/10/2025 at 09:00 AM (Mountain Time) via Telephonic Conference. See notice for info. Last day to oppose discharge or dischargeability is 8/11/2025. Proofs of Claim due by 7/16/2025.Government Proof of Claim Date 11/3/2025. (ad) |
|
utility
Corrective Entry
Thu 05/08 8:55 AM
Corrective Action: Please file the Corporate Ownership Statement separately using the correct event code: Bankruptcy / Other / Corporate Ownership Statement Corrective Action due by 5/13/2025. (ck) |
||
Wednesday, May 07, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Bond Filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee. (Cahoon, Brett) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
15 | 15
![]() Notice of Appointment of Sub-chapter V Trustee Filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee. (Cahoon, Brett) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
14 | 14
![]() Chapter 11 Guidelines Filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee. (Cahoon, Brett) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
13 | 13
![]() Certificate of Service Filed by Debtor PIVOT Operations LLC . (Christensen, Matthew) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Motion to Shorten Time Filed by Debtor PIVOT Operations LLC (Christensen, Matthew) |
|
11 | 11
![]() Notice of Hearing Filed by Debtor PIVOT Operations LLC . Miscellaneous hearing to be held on 5/13/2025 at 02:30 PM Telephonic Hearing for8 , (Christensen, Matthew) |
|
10 | 10
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Wed 05/07 1:21 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-00331 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A8588987. Fee amount 1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by Debtor PIVOT Operations LLC. (Christensen, Matthew) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Motion to Pay Payroll and Related Obligations Filed by Debtor PIVOT Operations LLC (Christensen, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
7 | 7
![]() Application to Employ Matthew T. Christensen as Counsel for Debtor . Filed by Debtor PIVOT Operations LLC Objections due by 06/2/2025. (Christensen, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
6 | 6
![]() Corporate Resolution Statement Filed by Debtor PIVOT Operations LLC. (Christensen, Matthew) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Signature page(s) Filed by Debtor PIVOT Operations LLC . (Christensen, Matthew) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by Debtor PIVOT Operations LLC. (Christensen, Matthew) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Disclosure of Compensation by Matthew T. Christensen Filed by Debtor PIVOT Operations LLC. (Christensen, Matthew) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Disclosure of Compensation by Filed by Debtor PIVOT Operations LLC. (Christensen, Matthew) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by PIVOT Operations LLC Chapter 11 Plan Small Business Subchapter V due by 08/5/2025. (Christensen, Matthew) |