Georgia Southern District Court
Judge:Dudley H Bowen
Referred: Brian K Epps
Case #: 3:25-cv-00053
Nature of Suit555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 07, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, May 09, 2025
8 8 5 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Fri 05/09 10:24 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.; denying5 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff must return both the Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement and the Consent to Collection of Fees from Trust Account to the Clerk within thirty days of this Order. PLRA due by 6/8/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brian K. Epps on 5/9/25. (wwp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
7 7 motion Preliminary Injunction Protective Order Wed 05/07 11:43 AM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and or MOTION for Protective Order, by Terique Hall. Responses due by 5/21/2025. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (jlh)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement Wed 05/07 11:29 AM
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Terique Hall. (jlh)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Appoint Counsel Wed 05/07 11:28 AM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel, by Terique Hall. Responses due by 5/21/2025. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (jlh)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Inmate Account Statement Wed 05/07 11:27 AM
Inmate Account Statement by Terique Hall. (jlh)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Consent to Collection of Fees Wed 05/07 11:23 AM
CONSENT by Prisoner Terique Hall to collection of fees. (jlh)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 05/07 11:21 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Terique Hall. Responses due by 5/21/2025. REFERRED to Judge Brian K. Epps. (jlh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 05/07 11:17 AM
COMPLAINT against all Defendants, filed by Terique Hall. (jlh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Supplement.