Maryland District Court
Judge:Chelsea J Crawford
Case #: 1:25-cv-01480
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1453 Class Action Fairness Act
Case Filed:May 07, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday May 07, 2025 2:07 PM EDT
Defendant
Kelly & Associates Insurance Group, Inc., D/B/A Kelly Benefits
1 Kelly Way
Sparks, MD 21152
Plaintiff
Troesch Brian
3539 South Winchester
Chicago, IL 60609
Represented By
Frederick A Douglas
Douglas And Boykin PLLC
contact info
Curtis Aaron Boykin
Douglas & Boykin PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 05/09 8:25 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Kelly & Associates Insurance Group, Inc..(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Thu 05/08 2:27 PM
NOTICE by Brian Troesch re1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet and Summons(Boykin, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Summons
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
4 4 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Thu 05/08 9:59 AM
QC NOTICE:1 Complaint filed by Brian Troesch was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Civil Cover Sheet and Summons. To correct this problem, file Civil Cover Sheet and Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Civil Cover Sheet and Summons to 1 Complaint. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 order 25 Pct Mag - Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order Thu 05/08 9:56 AM
Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsea J Crawford on 5/7/2025. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice 25 Pct Mag - Notice of Case Assignment to a Magistrate Judge Thu 05/08 9:55 AM
NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Chelsea J. Crawford. Brian Troesch or counsel for Brian Troesch are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Procedures which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded[LINK:here] , counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded[LINK:here] . To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge . Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/21/2025. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 32 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 05/07 1:25 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11959347.), filed by Troesch Brian.(Boykin, Curtis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
misc Jury Demand Thu 05/08 9:53 AM
Jury Trial Demand by Brian Troesch(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]